Novoa v. Charter Communications, LLC
Plaintiff: Luis Novoa, Michael Alvarez, Trevor Grant and Brian Belote-Dinford
Defendant: Charter Communications, LLC
Case Number: 1:2013cv01302
Filed: August 16, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Stanislaus
Presiding Judge: Barbara A McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 6, 2016. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 65 FINAL JUDGMENT and ORDER APPROVING CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 6/6/2016. CASE CLOSED. (Jessen, A)
June 3, 2016 Filing 64 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 6/3/2016: MOTION HEARING re Final Approval of Class Action Settlement (Doc. 62) and for Attorney Fees & Cost (Doc. 61) - held. Discussion. Order to follow. Plaintiffs Counsel Stuart Talley, in person - present. Megan Realin and David Markham, telephonic - present. Defendants Counsel Thomas Kaufman, telephonic - present. Court Reporter/CD Number: ECRO - Esther Valdez. (Herman, H)
June 3, 2016 Filing 63 PROPOSED ORDER re Final Judgment and Order Approving Class Action Settlement re #61 MOTION for ATTORNEY FEES and Costs and Plaintiffs' Service Enhancements, #62 MOTION for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement by Michael Alvarez, Brian Belote-Dinford, Trevor Grant, Luis Novoa. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Markham, David)
May 26, 2016 Filing 62 MOTION for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement by Michael Alvarez, Brian Belote-Dinford, Trevor Grant, Luis Novoa. Motion Hearing set for 6/3/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration of Tim Cunningham-Supplemental)(Talley, Stuart)
May 2, 2016 Filing 61 MOTION for ATTORNEY FEES and Costs and Plaintiffs' Service Enhancements by Michael Alvarez, Brian Belote-Dinford, Trevor Grant, Luis Novoa. Motion Hearing set for 6/3/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Approval of Attorneys' Fees and Costs and Plaintiffs' Service Enhancements, #2 Declaration of David R. Markham, #3 Declaration of Joseph Cho, #4 Declaration of Stuart C. Talley, #5 Declaration of Walter L. Haines, #6 Declaration of Tim Cunningham of CPT Group, Inc., #7 Declaration of Luis Novoa, #8 Declaration of Michael Alvarez, #9 Declaration of Brian Belote-Dinford, #10 Declaration of Trevor Grant, #11 Proposed Order and Final Judgment Approving Class Action Settlement, #12 Proof of Service)(Markham, David)
March 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER Granting Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement (Doc. 55). (1) No more than ten (10) business days after the Court grants Preliminary Approval. Last day for Defendant to provide Class Data List to Claims Administrator. (2) No more than ten (10) business days after receipt of Class Data List by Claims Administrator. Last day for Claims Administrator to mail and email Notice to Class Members. (3) No more than forty-five (45) days after mailing of Notice. Last day for requests for exclusion, and notice of objection to be submitted to Claims Administrator. (4) May 26, 2016 - Last day for Class Counsel to file Plaintiffs Motion for Attorneys Fees and Costs and Class Representatives Enhancement Awards. (5) May 26, 2016 - Last day for Class Counsel to file Plaintiffs Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement. (6) June 3, 2016 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. Hearing on Plaintiffs Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and Plaintiffs Motion for Attorneys Fees and Costs and Class Representatives Enhancement Awards. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 3/4/2016. (Herman, H)
March 1, 2016 Filing 59 DECLARATION of David R. Markham in SUPPORT OF #55 MOTION Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - revised Class Notice, #2 Proposed Order Granting Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement, #3 Proof of Service)(Markham, David)
February 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 58 MINUTE ORDER (TEXT Only): A hearing on the Motion for Preliminary Approval of the Class Settlement (Doc. 55) was held on February 19, 2016, and concerns regarding the pending motion were discussed. Counsel has agreed to meet and confer to revise the class notice and make other amendments. The parties will then file a revised proposed order along with the revised class notice amending the matters addressed on the record and email a Microsoft Word version to chambers. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 2/19/2016. (Herman, H)
February 19, 2016 Filing 57 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 2/19/2016: MOTION HEARING for Preliminary Approval of the Class Settlement (Doc. 55) - held. Order to follow. Plaintiffs Counsel David Markham and Stuart Talley, appeared by telephone - present. Defendants Counsel Thomas Kaufman, appeared by telephone - present. Court Reporter/CD Number: ECRO - O.Rosales. (Herman, H)
January 20, 2016 Filing 56 NOTICE of Errata RE Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of David R. Markham Filed in Support of Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement by All Plaintiffs re #55 MOTION Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Corrected Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of David R. Markham in Support of Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement, #2 Proof of Service)(Markham, David)
January 15, 2016 Filing 55 MOTION Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement by Michael Alvarez, Brian Belote-Dinford, Trevor Grant, Luis Novoa. Motion Hearing set for 2/19/2016 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. (Attachments: #1 Points and Authorities in Support of Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement, #2 Declaration of David R. Markham in Support of Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Markham Declaration, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Markham Declaration, #5 Declaration of Stuart C. Talley in Support of Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Class Action Settlement, #6 Declaration of Joseph Cho in Support of Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Class Action Settlement, #7 Proposed Order Granting Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement, #8 Proof of Service)(Markham, David)
December 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 54 CONSENT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE for all purposes to Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 12/2/2015. The new case number is 1:13-cv-01302-BAM. (Jessen, A)
December 1, 2015 Filing 53 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Charter Communications, LLC. (Kaufman, Thomas)
December 1, 2015 Filing 52 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Michael Alvarez, Brian Belote-Dinford, Trevor Grant, Luis Novoa. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Markham, David)
December 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MINUTE ORDER ***TEXT Only***: The parties have filed a Joint Notice of Class Action Settlement (Doc. 50) indicating that settlement has been reached in this case. In that notice, the parties also indicated that they agree to consent to the jurisdiction of the United States Magistrate Judge. The parties are ordered, no later than December 4, 2015, to file their consent forms. See, Doc. 3, Attach. 1. Further, pursuant to this Court's Local Rule 160, this Court ORDERS the parties, no later than January 18, 2016, to file their motion for preliminary approval of class action settlement. This Court VACATES all pending dates and matters. Failure to comply with this order may be grounds for the imposition of sanctions on counsel or parties who contributed to violation of this order. See Local Rule 160 and Local Rule 272. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 12/1/2015. (Herman, H)
November 30, 2015 Filing 50 NOTICE of SETTLEMENT Joint Notice of Class Action Settlement and Proposed Preliminary Approval Schedule by Michael Alvarez, Brian Belote-Dinford, Trevor Grant, Luis Novoa. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Regarding Preliminary Approval Schedule, #2 Proof of Service)(Markham, David)
September 8, 2015 Filing 49 ANSWER by Charter Communications, LLC.(Kaufman, Thomas)
September 1, 2015 Filing 48 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Walter L Haines on behalf of Michael Alvarez. Attorney Haines, Walter L added. (Haines, Walter)
August 31, 2015 Filing 47 (Joint Status Report) - STIPULATION by Charter Communications, LLC. (Kaufman, Thomas)
July 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 46 STIPULATION and ORDER to Vacate Hearing and Briefing Schedule on Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification Pending Mediation. (1) Class Certification briefing schedule and hearing of December 18, 2015 at 9:00 a.m. before Judge McAuliffe is VACATED pending Plaintiffs mediation; (2) The parties shall jointly report the mediation date to the Court by August 31, 2015; (3) The parties shall provide a joint case status report within 7 days of theconclusion of the mediation to advise the Court whether the settlement wasreached; (4) In case the parties mediation is unsuccessful, in the joint case status report, the parties shall provide new proposed dates for Class Certification briefing and hearing. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 7/28/2015. (Herman, H)
July 27, 2015 Filing 45 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for to Vacate Hearing and Briefing Schedule on Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification Pending Mediation by Michael Alvarez, Brian Belote-Dinford, Trevor Grant, Luis Novoa. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Markham, David)
July 27, 2015 Filing 44 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Walter L Haines on behalf of Luis Novoa. Attorney Haines, Walter L added. (Haines, Walter)
July 6, 2015 Filing 43 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Charter Communications, LLC by Luis Novoa. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Markham, David)
June 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 42 STIPULATION and ORDER for Plaintiff to File Second Amended Complaint by July 6, 2015. (1) Plaintiff may file his Second Amended Complaint by July 6, 2015; (2) Defendants response to Second Amended Complaint shall be due thirty(30) days after the Second Amended Complaint is filed. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 6/8/2015. (Herman, H)
June 3, 2015 Filing 41 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Plaintiff to File Second Amended Complaint by July 6, 2015 re #40 Stipulation and Order,,, Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings,, by Luis Novoa. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Markham, David)
June 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 40 STIPULATION and ORDER for Plaintiff to File Second Amended Complaint: upon the parties signed Stipulation filed on June 2, 2015, and based on the records in the above-captioned action, the Court hereby orders as follows: (1) Plaintiff may file his Second Amended Complaint no later than June 8, 2015; (2) Defendants response to Second Amended Complaint shall be due thirty (30) days after the Second Amended Complaint is filed. (3) All dates previously set (Doc. 34) remain in effect. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 6/3/2015. (Herman, H)
June 2, 2015 Filing 39 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Plaintiff to file Second Amended Complaint by Luis Novoa. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A to Stipulation - proposed Second Amended Complaint, #2 Proof of Service)(Markham, David)
April 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part Defendant's #17 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 4/21/2015. (Gaumnitz, R)
April 9, 2015 Filing 37 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Stuart C. Talley on behalf of Luis Novoa. Attorney Talley, Stuart C. added. (Talley, Stuart)
April 7, 2015 Filing 36 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by David Roger Markham on behalf of Luis Novoa. Attorney Markham, David Roger added. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Markham, David)
March 27, 2015 Filing 35 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Joseph Cho on behalf of Luis Novoa. (Cho, Joseph)
February 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER Continuing Deadlines Related to Class Certification. Pursuant to the Joint Stipulation (Doc. 33) filed by the Parties on January 30, 2015, and good cause appearing, the Court enters the following ORDER: (1)The current date to file and serve class certification motions of May 19, 2015, is continued to August 19, 2015. (2) The current date to file and serve oppositions to class certification motions of July 6, 2015, is continued to October 6, 2015. (3) The current date to file and serve reply briefs to class certification motions of September 3, 2015, is continued to December 3, 2015. (4) The current hearing date of September 17, 2015 (hearing date was really 9/18/2015, not 9/17/2015 the parties typed on the Order) for the Parties class certification motions, is continued to December 18, 2015, at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 2/2/2015. (Herman, H)
January 30, 2015 Filing 33 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Continuing Deadlines Related to Class Certification by Charter Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Continuing Deadlines Related to Class Certification, #2 Proof of Service)(Berkowitz, Paul)
November 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER Continuing Deadlines Related to Class Certification: (1)The current date to file & serve class certification motions of 2/16/2015 is continued to May 19, 2015. (2) The current date to file & serve oppositions to class certification motions of 4/7/2015 is continued to July 6, 2015. (3) The current date to file & serve reply briefs to class certification motions of 6/5/2015, is continued to September 3, 2015. (4) The current MOTION HEARING date of 6/19/2015 for the Parties' class certification motions is continued to September 18, 2015 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/19/2014. (Herman, H)
November 18, 2014 Filing 31 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for to Continue Deadlines Related to Class Certification by Charter Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Continuing Deadlines Related to Class Certification, #2 Proof of Service)(Berkowitz, Paul)
August 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER Continuing Deadlines Related to Class Certification: (1)The current date to file & serve class certification motions of 11/17/2014 is continued to February 16, 2015. (2) The current date to file & serve oppositions to class certification motions of 1/6/2015 is continued to April 7, 2015. (3) The current date to file & serve reply briefs to class certification motions of 3/6/2015, is continued to June 5, 2015. (4) The current MOTION HEARING date of 3/20/2015 for the Parties' class certification motions is continued to June 19, 2015 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 8/25/2014. (Herman, H)
August 22, 2014 Filing 29 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for - Joint Stipulation to Further Continue Deadlines Related to Class Certification by Charter Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Continuing Deadlines Related to Class Certification, #2 Proof of Service Proof of Service)(Berkowitz, Paul)
June 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Order VACATING June 30, 2014 hearing date and taking matter under submission, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 06/25/2014. (Figueroa, O)
June 23, 2014 Filing 27 REPLY by Charter Communications, LLC to RESPONSE to #17 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (Attachments: #1 Declaration - Supplemental Declaration of Thomas R. Kaufman in Support of Defendant's Reply Memorandum Re: Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #2 Objections to Evidence Plaintiff Submitted in Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #3 Proof of Service)(Berkowitz, Paul)
June 16, 2014 Filing 26 OBJECTIONS by Plaintiff Luis Novoa to #17 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (Love, Autumn)
June 16, 2014 Filing 25 APPENDIX by Luis Novoa re #17 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by Charter Communications, LLC. (Love, Autumn)
June 16, 2014 Filing 24 RESPONSE by Luis Novoa to #17 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (Love, Autumn)
June 16, 2014 Filing 23 DECLARATION in OPPOSITION TO #17 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (Love, Autumn)
June 16, 2014 Filing 22 DECLARATION in OPPOSITION TO #17 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (Love, Autumn)
June 16, 2014 Filing 21 DECLARATION in OPPOSITION TO #17 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (Love, Autumn)
June 16, 2014 Filing 20 OPPOSITION by Luis Novoa to #17 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (Love, Autumn)
May 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Continuing Deadlines Releated to Class Certification: (1)The current date to file & serve class certification motions of 8/18/2014 is continued to November 17, 2014. (2) The current date to file & serve oppositions to class certification motions of 10/3/2014 is continued to January 6, 2015. (3) The current date to file & serve reply briefs to class certification motions of 12/5/2014, is continued to March 6, 2015. (4) The current MOTION HEARING date of 12/19/2014 for the Parties' class certification motions is continued to March 20, 2015 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 5/29/2014. (Herman, H)
May 27, 2014 Filing 18 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Joint Stipulation to Continue Deadlines Related To Class Certification by Charter Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Continuing Deadlines Related to Class Certification, #2 Proof of Service)(Berkowitz, Paul)
May 20, 2014 Filing 17 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Charter Communications, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 6/30/2014 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #2 Statement of Undisputed Material Facts in Support of Motion, #3 Appendix of Evidence in Support of Motion (Volume I of II), #4 Appendix of Evidence in Support of Motion (Volume II of II), #5 Proposed Order Proposed Order, #6 Proof of Service Proof of Service)(Berkowitz, Paul)
December 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER. the following dates for class certification only: (1) Class Certification Motion Filing Deadline by 8/18/2014. (2) Class Certification Opposition by 10/3/2014. (3) Class Certification Reply by 12/5/2014. MOTION for Class Certification HEARING set for 12/19/2014 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 12/19/2013. (Herman, H)
December 17, 2013 Filing 15 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 12/17/2013: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held. Order to follow. Plaintiffs Counsel Autumn Love appeared telephonically - present. Defendants Counsel Thomas Kaufman appeared telephonically - present. Court Reporter/CD Number: in chambers, off record. (Herman, H)
December 10, 2013 Filing 14 JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT by Charter Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Berkowitz, Paul)
November 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER ***TEXT Only***: TIME Change Only - Due to the press of business, Initial SCHEDULING CONFERENCE is set for December 17, 2013 at 08:00 AM (was 8:30a.m.) in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. Telephonic appearance ONLY. Plaintiffs counsel shall make arrangements for a conference call with the AT&T operator (if counsel does not have conference call capabilities on their telephone systems), and shall initiate the call at the above-designated time. After all parties are on the line, the call should then be placed to Judge McAuliffe's chambers at (559)499-5789. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/21/2013. (Herman, H)
October 31, 2013 Filing 12 ANSWER to #11 Amended Complaint by Charter Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Berkowitz, Paul)
October 31, 2013 Filing 11 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Charter Communications, LLC by Luis Novoa.(Love, Autumn)
October 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER for Plaintiff to File the First Amended Complaint. (1) Plaintiff's request for leave to file a First Amended Complaint is GRANTED; (2) On or before November 1, 2013, Plaintiff shall file his First Amended Complaint, attached as Exhibit 2 to the Stipulation, as a separate entry in the docket for purposes of clarifying the record; (3) On or before November 1, 2013, Defendant shall file its answer, previously filed in state court, as a separate entry in the docket for purposes of clarifying the record. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/30/2013. (Herman, H)
October 29, 2013 Filing 9 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Plaintiff to File First Amended Complaint by Luis Novoa. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order re: First Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit First Amended Complaint)(Love, Autumn)
September 26, 2013 Filing 8 DECLINE to PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Charter Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Berkowitz, Paul)
September 3, 2013 Filing 7 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Thomas R. Kaufman on behalf of Charter Communications, LLC. (Kaufman, Thomas)
August 23, 2013 Filing 6 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Vartan Serge Madoyan on behalf of Charter Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Madoyan, Vartan)
August 22, 2013 Filing 5 NOTICE of Compliance with Section 1446(d) by Charter Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Notice of Compliance, #2 Proof of Service)(Berkowitz, Paul)
August 20, 2013 Filing 4 NOTICE of Court's Order Setting Mandatory Settlement Conference by Charter Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Notice of Court's Order Setting Mandatory Settlement Conference, #2 Proof of Service)(Berkowitz, Paul)
August 16, 2013 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 12/17/2013 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Verduzco, M)
August 16, 2013 RECEIPT number #CAE100023358 $400.00 fbo Charter Communications LLC by Paul Berkowitz on 8/16/2013. (Lundstrom, T)
August 16, 2013 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Stanislaus County Superior Court, case number 2001130. by Charter Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal of Action, #2 Exhibit B to Notice of Removal of Action, #3 Exhibit C to Notice of Removal of Action, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Declaration of Kimberly Glazebrook In Support of Notice of Removal, #6 Proof of Service)(Berkowitz, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Novoa v. Charter Communications, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Novoa
Represented By: Joseph Cho
Represented By: Ronald H. Bae
Represented By: Stuart C. Talley
Represented By: Autumn L. Moore
Represented By: David Roger Markham
Represented By: Walter L. Haines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Alvarez
Represented By: Stuart C. Talley
Represented By: David Roger Markham
Represented By: Ronald H. Bae
Represented By: Joseph Cho
Represented By: Walter L. Haines
Represented By: Peggy J. Reali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trevor Grant
Represented By: Stuart C. Talley
Represented By: David Roger Markham
Represented By: Ronald H. Bae
Represented By: Joseph Cho
Represented By: Peggy J. Reali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Belote-Dinford
Represented By: Stuart C. Talley
Represented By: David Roger Markham
Represented By: Ronald H. Bae
Represented By: Joseph Cho
Represented By: Peggy J. Reali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charter Communications, LLC
Represented By: Vartan Serge Madoyan
Represented By: Paul Berkowitz
Represented By: Thomas R. Kaufman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?