Harrison v. Diaz et al
Plaintiff: Michael D. Harrison
Defendant: R.M. Diaz, V. Black and K. Allison
Case Number: 1:2013cv01335
Filed: August 22, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Gary S. Austin
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 33 Motion to Return Filing Fee; ORDER EXTENDING Time to File Objections to Findings and Recommendations; Objections Due in Thirty Days signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/25/2016. (Sant Agata, S)
February 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 32 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS that this 26 Action be Dismissed for Failure to State a Claim upon which Relief Could be Granted and that this Action Count as a Strike signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 02/08/2016. Referred to Judge O'Neill; Objections to F&R due by 3/14/2016.(Flores, E)
January 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 29 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that this Action be DISMISSED for Plaintiff's Failure to Obey a Court Order re 26 Amended Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/4/2016. Referred to Judge O'Neill. Objections to F&R due within thirty (30) days. (Jessen, A)
December 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE why this Action Should not be Dismissed for failure to Prosecute and to Obey a Court Order signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/30/2015. Show Cause Response due by 1/4/2016.(Flores, E)
January 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 18 Motion for the Court to Collect the Filing Fee; ORDER for Plaintiff to Send Payment of Filing Fee to Court by February 25, 2014 signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 1/27/2014. (Sant Agata, S)
October 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Denying 12 Motion for Leave to Defer Payment of Filing Fee Until End of Case; ORDER Extending Deadline to Pay Filing Fee to November 30, 2013, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 10/16/13. (Gonzalez, R)
September 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Granting 10 Motion to Extend Time to Pay $400.00 Filing Fee in Full signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 09/26/2013. Filing Fee due by 11/7/2013. (Flores, E)
September 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DENYING Application 8 to Proceed In Forma Pauperis; ORDER for Plaintiff to Pay $400.00 Filing Fee in Full Within Thirty Days, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 9/10/2013. (Marrujo, C)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harrison v. Diaz et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael D. Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R.M. Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: V. Black
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Allison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?