Lescallett v. Diaz et al
Plaintiff: Darrell Junior Lescallett
Defendant: R. Diaz, T. Perez, R. Broomfield, B. J. Weaver and R. McMurrey
Case Number: 1:2013cv01342
Filed: August 23, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Barbara A. McAuliffe
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that all Doe Defendants be DISMISSED and this aciton CLOSED, without prejudice, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4 (m) re 11 Amended Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint filed by Darrell Junior Lescallett ; referred to Judge O'Neill,signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 05/01/17. Objections to F&R due (14-Day Deadline) (Martin-Gill, S)
April 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE why Doe Defendants should not be dismissed and this action closed signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/5/2017. Show Cause Response due within 21-Days.(Lundstrom, T)
March 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER Adopting 46 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Defendants' 28 Motion for Summary Judgment be Granted signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 3/30/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
March 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that 28 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment be GRANTED re 11 Amended Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 3/10/2017. Referred to Judge O'Neill. Objections to F&R due within fourteen (14) days. (Jessen, A)
February 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER denying 37 Request to Supplement Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 2/24/2017. (Lundstrom, T)
September 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER denying 43 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 9/29/2016. (Lundstrom, T)
September 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 41 Motion to Appoint Counsel Without Prejudice signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 9/6/16. (Marrujo, C)
June 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER REQUIRING PLAINTIFF to File Opposition or Statement of Non-Opposition to 28 Motion for Summary Judgment Within Thirty (30) Days signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 6/19/2016. (Jessen, A)
February 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 26 Motion for status on case and extension of time signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 2/12/2016. (Lundstrom, T)
July 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER ADOPTING 14 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Dismissal of Certain Claims and Defendants signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 7/21/2015. (Jessen, A)
June 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 14 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that Certain Claims and Defendants be DISMISSED re 11 Amended Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 6/26/2015. Referred to Judge O'Neill. Objections to F&R due within fourteen (14) days. (Jessen, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lescallett v. Diaz et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrell Junior Lescallett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Broomfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. J. Weaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. McMurrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?