Aluya v. Management & Training Corporation
Plaintiff: Joseph Usunubu Aluya
Defendant: Management & Training Corporation
Case Number: 1:2013cv01345
Filed: August 22, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER Directing the Clerk to Close the Action Based upon the Parties' Stipulation to Dismiss this Action with Prejudice signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 11/01/2017. CASE CLOSED.(Flores, E)
August 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER AFTER 147 NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/30/2017. All pending dates, conferences and hearings are VACATED. Stipulated dismissal due by 10/30/2017. (Hall, S)
August 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE CASES FOR TRIAL, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 8/7/2017. (Kusamura, W)
June 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER on Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment re Premises Liability (Doc Nos. 80 81 ) signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 6/27/2017. It is hereby ordered that (1) Defendant's motion for summary judgment on Plaintiffs' in dividual claims for premises liability is DENIED as to all Plaintiffs. (2) The Clerk of the Court shall file this decision in each separate case: Aluya v. Management & Training Corp. 13cv1345; Hammond v. Management & Training Corp. 13cv1209; and Sutton v. Management & Training Corp 13cv1344. (Valdez, E)
January 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 77 FURTHER SCHEDULING ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/10/2017. Briefing related to MTC's duties: Filing Deadline 2/24/2017; Response Deadline 3/17/2017. Expert Discovery Deadline 3/13/2017. Non-Dispositive Motion Dead lines: Filed by 3/27/2017; Hearing by 4/24/2017. Pretrial Conference set for 6/28/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii. Jury Trial set for 9/12/2017 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii. (Hall, S)
July 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER GRANTING 50 Motion for Summary Judgment signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 7/10/2015. CASE CLOSED. (Sant Agata, S)
June 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER Granting Stipulated Leave to File Sur-Reply, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 6/17/2015. (The court hereby GRANTS 59 Plaintiff's request for leave to file a sur-reply. Such sur-reply shall be filed and served not later than seven (7) days from the date of service of this order.) (Gaumnitz, R)
March 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER DENYING 48 Stipulation to Amend Case Schedule, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/27/2015. (Hall, S)
January 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER DENYING 44 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Further Responses to Discovery Requests, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/29/2015. (Hall, S)
December 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 42 AMENDED ORDER GRANTING IN PART 37 Stipulation to Amend Scheduling Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/5/2014. (Hall, S)
November 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER GRANTING IN PART 37 Stipulation to Amend Scheduling Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 11/26/2014. Discovery Deadlines: Deposition of Dr. Rucker to be completed by 12/31/2014; Expert Discovery to be completed by 3/27/2015. Non-Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filed by 3/30/2015; Hearing by 5/27/2015. Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filed by 5/4/2015; Hearing by 6/22/2015. (Hall, S)
November 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER GRANTING 34 Plaintiff's Request for Telephonic Appearance, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 11/17/2014. (Hall, S)
August 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER GRANTING 31 Joint Stipulation to Continue Settlement Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/5/2014. Settlement Conference CONTINUED to 11/20/2014 at 01:30 PM in Bakersfield at 510 19th Street (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Hall, S)
May 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER GRANTING 27 Stipulation to Continue Settlement Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 5/6/2014. Settlement Conference CONTINUED to 8/26/2014 at 01:30 PM in Bakersfield at 510 19th Street (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Hall, S)
November 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER DENYING Defendant's Motion to Stay Without Prejudice 14 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 11/13/2013. (Hall, S)
September 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DIRECTING Clerk of the Court to Reassign Action to the Honorable Jennifer L. Thurston. New Case Number: 1:13-cv-01345 AWI JLT, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 08/30/2013. (Martin-Gill, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aluya v. Management & Training Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Usunubu Aluya
Represented By: Jason Kenneth Feldman
Represented By: Ian Michael Wallach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Management & Training Corporation
Represented By: Susan Eileen Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?