Sanders v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Sheila M. Sanders
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2013cv01380
Filed: August 28, 2013
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Stanislaus
Presiding Judge: Sandra M. Snyder
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 30 STIPULATION and ORDER AWARDING plaintiff attorney's fees and expenses under the Equal Access to Justice Act in the amount of $7,020.31. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 5/18/2015. (Rooney, M)
February 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's Social Security Appeal and REMANDING Action for Further Administrative Proceedings signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 2/16/2015. CASE CLOSED. (Sant Agata, S)
September 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION and ORDER GRANTING the parties' request for an extension of time to 9/29/2014 for receipt of defendant's responsive brief. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 9/29/2014. (Rooney, M)
August 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATION and ORDER GRANTING the parties' request for an extension of time to 9/22/2014 for receipt of defendant's brief, with all other deadlines extended, accordingly. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 8/25/2014. (Rooney, M)
July 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION and ORDER GRANITNG Commissiner's First Extenion of Time, signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 7/23/2014. (Kusamura, W)
March 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION and ORDER GRANTING the parties' request for an extension of time to 4/18/2014 for receipt of plaintiff's opening brief. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 3/17/2014. (Rooney, M)
January 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION and ORDER GRANTING the parties' request for an extension of time to 2/12/2014 for receipt of the certified administrative record to be filed by defendant. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder of 1/13/2014.(Rooney, M)
September 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING 3 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 9/5/2013. (Sant Agata, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanders v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheila M. Sanders
Represented By: Kelsey Mackenzie Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Susan L. Smith, GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?