Nation et al v. Abbiss
Plaintiff: Sonja Nation and Jeremiah Nation
Defendant: Paula Abbiss
Case Number: 1:2013cv01408
Filed: August 30, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Tulare
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Seng
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER on Notice of Voluntary Dismissal With Prejudice Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1), signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 2/28/14. (CASE CLOSED)(Hellings, J)
February 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION and ORDER to Continue the Initial Scheduling Conference from March 6, 2014 to May 8, 2014 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 6 (MJS) before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 02/27/2014. (Yu, L)
January 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT; ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 1/10/2014. (Yu, L)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nation et al v. Abbiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonja Nation
Represented By: Douglas Stewart Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremiah Nation
Represented By: Douglas Stewart Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paula Abbiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?