Tri-Dam v. Holman et al
Plaintiff: Tri-Dam
Defendant: Merle Holman and Beverly Holman
Case Number: 1:2013cv01448
Filed: September 9, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Presiding Judge: Sheila K. Oberto
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER Entering Stipulated Judgment and Closing Case signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 8/19/2015. CASE CLOSED. (Jessen, A)
January 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATION and ORDER GRANTING the parties' request for a continuance of the following discovery deadlines: Non-Expert Discovery due by 2/11/2015; Expert Discovery due by 4/8/2015; Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 2/18/2015; Supplemental Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 3/6/2015. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 1/6/2015. (Rooney, M)
October 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION and ORDER GRANTING the parties' request to modify the scheduling order as follows: Non-Expert Discovery deadline set for 1/7/2015; Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 1/15/2015; and Supplemental Expert Witness Designation due by 2/6/2015. All other remaining dates are otherwise unaffected by this stipulation and order. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 10/21/2014. (Rooney, M)
September 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Stipulation and order to file amended complaint and continue discovery deadlines, signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 9/16/2014. (Non expert discovery due by 10/31/2014; Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 11/25/2014; Expert Discovery due by 2/16/2015; Non-Dispositive Motions filed by 2/27/2015) (Figueroa, O)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tri-Dam v. Holman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tri-Dam
Represented By: Thomas Eric Marrs
Represented By: Kevin M. Seibert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merle Holman
Represented By: Shawn R Parr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beverly Holman
Represented By: Shawn R Parr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?