Aguayo v. Katavich
Plaintiff: Alex iAguayo
Defendant: John N. Katavich
Case Number: 1:2013cv01454
Filed: September 11, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER DISMISSING ACTION, With Prejudice, for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief May be Granted Under Section 1983; ORDER That Dismissal is Subject to 28 U.S.C. 1915(g), signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 2/13/14. CASE CLOSED (Strike)(Marrujo, C)
January 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER To SHOW CAUSE Why The Action Should Not Be Dismissed For Plaintiff's Failure To Comply With The Court's Order (Docs. 7 , 10 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/8/2014. Show Cause Response due by 1/24/2014.(Fahrney, E)
December 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Denying 11 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/30/13. (Verduzco, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aguayo v. Katavich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John N. Katavich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alex iAguayo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?