McCoy v. Garikaparthi et al
Plaintiff: LaKeith L. McCoy
Defendant: M. Garikaparthi, A. Steiber, J. Keeler and T. Chavez
Case Number: 1:2013cv01495
Filed: September 16, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Barbara A. McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 69 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Defendants' 58 Motion for Summary Judgment signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 2/26/2019. Referred to Judge Dale A. Drozd. Objections to F&R due within Fourteen (14) Days. (Sant Agata, S)
February 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER GRANTING Defendants' 56 Motion to Modify Scheduling Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 2/27/18. Dispositive Motions filed by 4/19/2018. (Marrujo, C)
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER Denying 52 Motion to Appoint Counsel; ORDER Denying 53 Motion for Appointment of Medical Expert; ORDER Denying 54 Motion for Modification of Discovery and Scheduling Order signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 12/06/2017. (Flores, E)
April 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER DIRECTING Defendants Garikaparthi, Steiber, Keeler and Chavez to File Responsive Pleading,signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 04/04/2017. (21-Day Deadline) (Martin-Gill, S)
March 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER ADOPTING 47 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS Denying 39 Motion to Dismiss signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 03/02/2017.(Flores, E)
February 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Defendants' 39 Motion to Dismiss signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 02/01/2017. Referred to Judge Drozd; Objections to F&R due by 2/21/2017.(Flores, E)
February 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER Overruling Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Request for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 02/03/2016. (Flores, E)
January 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER Regarding 35 Defendants' Notice of Withdrawal of Motion and Ex Parte Request for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings; ORDER Terminating 26 Defendants' Motion for Order Revoking Plaintiff's In Forma Pauperis Status or Dismissing Case; and ORDER Granting Defendants Until 2/18/2016 to File a Responsive Pleading signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/20/2016. (Jessen, A)
December 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 27 Motion for Entry of Default; ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 28 Motion for a Civil Subpoena signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 12/9/2015. (Sant Agata, S)
December 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER regarding IFP status on appeal re 16 USCA Order signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 12/8/2014. (Lundstrom, T)
November 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER DISMISSING ACTION for Failure to State a Claim, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/19/2014. CASE CLOSED. (Jessen, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCoy v. Garikaparthi et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LaKeith L. McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Garikaparthi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Steiber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Keeler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Chavez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?