Dynes v. Marquez et al
Plaintiff: John Ray Dynes
Defendant: Marquez and Fresno County Jail Medical Department
Case Number: 1:2013cv01502
Filed: September 17, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Seng
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Voluntary Dismissal Of Action (ECF No. 18 ), Clerk Shall Close Case, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 7/24/2014. CASE CLOSED. (Fahrney, E)
July 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's Motion For Copy Of Pleading (ECF No. 16 ), Clerk To Provide Plaintiff With A Copy Of The First Amended Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 7/21/2014. (Fahrney, E)
July 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Directing Plaintiff To SHOW CAUSE Why His In Forma Pauperis Status Should Not Be Revoked (ECF No. 4 ), Twenty-One Day Deadline, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 7/12/2014. Show Cause Response due by 8/7/2014. (Fahrney, E)
November 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Denying 11 Motion for Medical Records; Clerk to Copy Fresno County Sheriff's Office with Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 11/23/13. (Gonzalez, R)
October 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DISREGARDING 8 Motion to Proceed IFP AS MOOT signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 10/7/2013. (Jessen, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dynes v. Marquez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fresno County Jail Medical Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Ray Dynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?