Cottrell v. Ogbuehi et al
Plaintiff: Dale L. Cottrell
Defendant: Felix Igbinosa, Ifeoma Ogbuehi, Rajib Das, Miran Park, Angelica Duenas, C. Lackey and Karen Berard
Case Number: 1:2013cv01530
Filed: September 23, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: Stanley A. Boone
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER Directing Clerk of Court to Close Case Pursuant to Parties' Stipulation for Voluntary Dismissal 109 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/25/17. (CASE CLOSED)(Hellings, J)
May 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER That Inmate Dale L. Cottrell is No Longer Needed as a Participant in These Proceedings, and the Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum is Discharged, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 5/23/17. (Hellings, J)
April 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER & WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM to Transport Inmate Dale L. Cottrell, CDCR #P-44493 on 5/23/2017 at 1:00 PM, Courtroom 10 (EPG), signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/14/17. (Hellings, J)
March 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 3/20/2017 re 78 , 85 , 86 , 87 , 88 , 89 , 90 , 91 , 92 , 96 , 99 , 100 , 101 . (Lundstrom, T)
February 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 100 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that 78 Motion for Summary Judgment be Granted In Part and Denied In Part as follows: Defendants Das, Duenas, Igbinosa, Ogbuehi, and Park's Motion for Summary Judgment be GRANTED; Defendants Lackey and Berard's Motion for Summary Judgment be DENIED ;referred to Judge O'Neill,signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 02/09/2017. Objections to F&R due : 30-Day Deadline (Martin-Gill, S)
February 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE Why Does 1 through 3 should not be Dismissed from the action,signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 02/08/17. Show Cause Response due (30-Day Deadline). (Martin-Gill, S)
January 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER REGARDING Plaintiff's Notice of Failure to Receive Defendants' Reply to His Opposition and DIRECTING Clerk of Court to Serve Courtesy Copy of Defendants' Reply on Plaintiff, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/30/17. (Marrujo, C)
July 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER DENYING 50 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment Without Prejudice for Failure to Provide Rand Notice, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/18/16. Fourteen Day Deadline. (Marrujo, C)
January 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER Regarding Plaintiff's Request For Clarification (ECF No. 60 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/22/2016. (Fahrney, E)
December 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER DENYING, WITHOUT PREJUDICE, Plaintiff's 58 Motion to Appoint a Independent Expert Witness; ORDER GRANTING Thirty (30) Day Extension to Time to File an Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/18/2015. (Martin-Gill, S)
November 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER GRANTING Defendant's 50 Motion to Vacate Deposition Deadline;Deadline for taking Plaintiff's deposition shall be Vacated and Reset, if necessary, after resolution of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/30/2015. (Martin-Gill, S)
August 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER IMPOSING SERVICE COSTS ON DEFENDANT PARK AND REQUIRING HIM TO REIMBURSE USM $77.25 WITHIN THIRTY DAYS re 42 , 43 , 46 signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/26/2015. (Lundstrom, T)
August 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER Extending Discovery and Scheduling Order to Defendant Lackey 36 , 47 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/26/15. (Hellings, J)
July 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER REQUIRING Defendant Miran Park to SHOW CAUSE Why Expense of Personal Service Should not be Taxed Against him signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/15/2015. (Sant Agata, S)
July 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER Extending Discovery and Scheduling Order to Defendant Miran Park signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/14/2015. (Sant Agata, S)
May 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER Denying 38 Plaintiff's Motion for Appointment of Counsel, without Prejudice, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/12/15. (Gonzalez, R)
December 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER VACATING 26 Order to Show Cause and GRANTING Plaintiff's 25 Request to Extend Time to Complete and Return Service of Process Forms signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/3/2014. (Sant Agata, S)
December 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE Why Action Should Not be Dismissed for Failure to Prosecute, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/2/2014. Show Cause Response Due Within Thirty Days. (Marrujo, C)
July 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER VACATING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION in Light of Filing of Amended Complaint 15 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/24/14: The Court will screen the amended complaint filed on June 30, 2014, in due course. (Hellings, J)
June 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 15 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATION Recommending Dismissal of 1 Action for Failure to State a Cognizable Claim for Relief signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/27/2014. Referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. Objections to F&R due by 7/18/2014. (Sant Agata, S)
September 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Denying 3 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 09/25/2013. (Flores, E)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cottrell v. Ogbuehi et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Felix Igbinosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ifeoma Ogbuehi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rajib Das
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miran Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angelica Duenas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Lackey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Berard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dale L. Cottrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?