Cranford v. Smith
Plaintiff: Archie Cranford
Defendant: Ebony Smith
Case Number: 1:2013cv01555
Filed: September 26, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Gary S. Austin
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER DISMISSING CASE, with Prejudice, for Failure to State a Claim upon which Relief may be Granted under Section 1983 signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 06/05/2014. CASE CLOSED.(Flores, E)
March 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 17 Motion for TRO signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 03/19/2014. (Flores, E)
December 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 10 Motion for Default Judgment signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 12/11/2013. (Flores, E)
October 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis 5 , signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 10/24/13. (Hellings, J)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cranford v. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ebony Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Archie Cranford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?