Krikorian v. Northfield Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Avedis Krikorian
Defendant: Northfield Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2013cv01563
Filed: September 26, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Boone
Referring Judge: Dale A Drozd
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 12 U.S.C. ยง 635
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2016. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to close the case signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 7/8/2016. CASE CLOSED.(Lundstrom, T)
July 8, 2016 Filing 45 STIPULATION for Dismissal With Prejudice of Entire Action by Avedis Krikorian. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McKeon, Heather)
June 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER Granting Extension of Time to File Dispositive Documents re #43 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/7/16. Thirty Day Deadline. (Gonzalez, R)
June 6, 2016 Filing 43 NOTICE & Request to Continue by 30 Days Deadline to File Dismissal With Prejudice by Avedis Krikorian. Attorney Cohen, Michael Lee added. (Cohen, Michael)
May 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER REQUIRING PARTIES TO FILE DISPOSITIONAL DOCUMENTS WITHIN THIRTY DAYS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/4/2016. (Hernandez, M)
May 2, 2016 Filing 41 NOTICE of SETTLEMENT by Northfield Insurance Company. (DeLaney, Kathleen)
May 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MINUTE ORDER: (TEXT ENTRY ONLY) The parties notified the Court that the case has settled. A Notice of Settlement shall be filed with the Court. The Settlement Conference set for 5/3/2016 is taken off calendar. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/2/2016. (Hernandez, M)
April 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER SETTING Settlement Conference for 5/3/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. Confidential settlement statements are due seven days prior to the scheduled date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/5/2016. (Hernandez, M)
February 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER CONTINUING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. The parties shall meet and confer regarding alternative dates for the Settlement Conference and shall provide those dates to the Court on or before February 11, 2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/4/2016. (Hernandez, M)
January 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 37 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Disclosure 1/15/2016; Non Expert Discovery 6/14/2016; Expert Disclosure 5/17/2016; Supplemental Expert Disclosure 6/14/2016; Expert Discovery 6/28/2016; Non-Dispositive Motions filed by 6/14/2016; Dispositive Motions filed by 6/28/2016; Settlement Conference set for 2/11/2016 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone; Pretrial Conference set for 8/29/2016 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd; Jury Trial set for 11/1/2016 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/19/2016. (Hernandez, M)
January 15, 2016 Filing 36 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 1/15/2016. The Court to issue a Scheduling Conference Order. Parties were sent via email SAB Chambers Procedures (October 2015) Plaintiffs Counsel Heather McKeon by telephone. Defendants Counsel G Edward Rudloff and Kathleen DeLaney by telephone. Court Reporter/CD Number: In chambers and off the record. (Hernandez, M)
January 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/13/2016. (Kusamura, W)
January 12, 2016 Filing 34 DECLARATION of Heather M. McKeon re #33 Order to Show Cause. (McKeon, Heather)
January 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILING TO APPEAR AT SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/6/2016. (Hernandez, M)
January 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MINUTE ORDER: (TEXT ENTRY ONLY) No appearance made by the plaintiffs. The Court continues the Scheduling Conference to 1/15/2016 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/5/2016. (Hernandez, M)
December 29, 2015 Filing 31 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Avedis Krikorian. (McKeon, Heather)
December 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.: Due to the appointment of Judge Dale A. Drozd to the position of U.S. District Judge, this action is reassigned from *District Judge Anthony W. Ishii* to District Judge Dale A. Drozd for all further proceedings. (Flores, E)
December 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE for 1/5/2016 at 3:30 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/1/2015. (Hernandez, M)
November 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER LIFTING STAY, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 11/30/15. (Gonzalez, R)
November 25, 2015 Filing 27 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Northfield Insurance Company. (DeLaney, Kathleen)
August 28, 2015 Filing 26 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Avedis Krikorian. (McKeon, Heather)
May 29, 2015 Filing 25 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Avedis Krikorian. (McKeon, Heather)
February 27, 2015 Filing 24 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Northfield Insurance Company. (Rudloff, G.)
February 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER directing the parties to file a joint status report by 2/28/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/11/2015. (Hernandez, M)
December 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/17/2014. (Kusamura, W)
December 17, 2014 Filing 21 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone: SHOW CAUSE HEARING held on 12/17/2014. The Court to issue a written order. Plaintiffs Counsel Heather McKeon by telephone. Defendants Counsel Kathleen Delaney by telephone. Court Reporter/CD Number: ECRO O Figueroa. (Hernandez, M)
December 10, 2014 Filing 20 RESPONSE to ORDER to SHOW CAUSE by Northfield Insurance Company. (Rudloff, G.)
November 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER requiring parties to show cause why the stay of this action should not be lifted and setting a Show Cause Hearing for 12/17/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/14/2014. (Hernandez, M)
October 28, 2014 Filing 18 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Northfield Insurance Company. (DeLaney, Kathleen)
July 30, 2014 Filing 17 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Avedis Krikorian. (McKeon, Heather)
May 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER requiring parties to file status report every ninety days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/5/2014. (Hernandez, M)
April 30, 2014 Filing 15 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Avedis Krikorian. (McKeon, Heather)
January 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER requiring parties to file status report by May 1, 2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/6/2014. (Hernandez, M)
December 19, 2013 Filing 13 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Avedis Krikorian. (McKeon, Heather)
November 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER vacating mandatory Scheduling Conference and requiring parties to file status report within 45 days. The Scheduling Conference set for 12/3/2013 is VACATED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/18/2013. (Hernandez, M)
November 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER: (TEXT ENTRY ONLY) Pursuant to the stipulation between the parties and the Court approving the stay of this action until the completion of the appraisal process. The Scheduling Conference set for 12/3/2013 before Magistrate Judge Boone is taken off calendar until further notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/18/2013. (Hernandez, M)
November 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION and ORDER to stay case signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 11/15/2013. CASE STAYED.(Lundstrom, T)
November 15, 2013 Filing 9 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Stay of Proceeding by Northfield Insurance Company. (Rudloff, G.)
October 1, 2013 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Northfield Insurance Company. (Rudloff, G.)
September 30, 2013 Filing 7 NOTICE Of Scheduling Conference by Avedis Krikorian. (McKeon, Heather)
September 30, 2013 Filing 6 DEMAND for TRIAL by JURY by Avedis Krikorian. (McKeon, Heather)
September 27, 2013 Filing 5 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 12/3/2013 at 09:45 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Fahrney, E)
September 26, 2013 Filing 3 NOTICE Certification of Interested Parties or Persons [Federal Rules of Civ.Proc., Rule 7.1] by Northfield Insurance Company re #2 Notice - Other,. (Rudloff, G.)
September 26, 2013 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal Under 28 U.S.C. Section 1441(b) (Diversity) by Northfield Insurance Company re #1 Civil Cover Sheet. (Attachments: #1 Notice Notice of Removal - Part 2, #2 Notice Notice of Removal - Part 3, #3 Notice Notice of Removal - Part 4)(Rudloff, G.)
September 26, 2013 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Northfield Insurance Company (Rudloff, G.)
September 26, 2013 RECEIPT number #CAE100023758 $400.00 fbo Northfield Insurance Company by G Edward Rudloff on 9/26/2013. (Jessen, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Krikorian v. Northfield Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northfield Insurance Company
Represented By: Marjie D. Barrows
Represented By: Sherolyn Lee
Represented By: Kathleen M. DeLaney
Represented By: G. Edward Rudloff, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Avedis Krikorian
Represented By: Heather Michelle McKeon
Represented By: Michael Lee Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?