U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Farmers Insurance Exchange
Plaintiff: U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Defendant: Farmers Insurance Exchange
Case Number: 1:2013cv01574
Filed: September 30, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Presiding Judge: Sheila K. Oberto
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 66 CONSENT DECREE signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 10/26/2016. CASE CLOSED. (Lundstrom, T)
July 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER re: Plaintiff and Defendant's Status Report, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 7/11/2016. (Kusamura, W)
February 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 59 FOURTH JOINT STIPULATION and ORDER to EXTEND Discovery and Trial Deadlines. Non-Expert Discovery Deadline: 6/17/2016. Expert Disclosures: 6/29/2016. Rebuttal-Supplemental Expert Disclosures: 7/8/2016. Expert Discovery Deadline: 7/ 22/2016. Non-Dispositive Motion Filing Deadline: 7/27/2016. Non-Dispositive Motion Hearing Deadline: 8/24/2016. Dispositive Motion (MSJ) Filing Deadline: 8/1/2016. Dispositive Motion (MSJ) Hearing Deadline: 9/6/2016. Pretrial Conference set for 10/20/2016, at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii. The trial remains set for 12/6/2016, at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 2/23/2016. (Timken, A)
October 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 56 STIPULATION and ORDER to EXTEND Discovery and Trial Deadlines. the Scheduling Order shall be amended as follows: Non-expert discovery shall be completed by March 18, 2016; Expert disclosure shall be completed by April 15, 2016; Sup plemental expert disclosure shall be completed by May 13, 2016; Expert discovery shall be completed by June 27, 2016; Non dispositive motions shall be filed by June 26, 2016, and heard by July 27, 2016; Dispositive motions shall be filed by Jul y 18, 2016, and heard by August 29, 2016; the Pretrial conference shall be held on October 13, 2106, at 10:00 a.m., in Courtroom 2; and Trial shall commence on December 6, 2016, at 8:30 a.m., in Courtroom 2. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 10/16/2015. (Timken, A)
June 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 53 Joint Stipulation to extend discovery and trial deadlines; Order thereon, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 6/2/2015. (Non Expert Discovery due by 1/8/2016; Expert Disclosure due by 1/29/2016; Expert Discovery due by 3/18/2016; Non-Dispo sitive Motions filed by 4/1/2016; Dispositive Motions filed by 4/22/2016; Pretrial Conference set for 7/20/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii; Jury Trial set for 8/30/2016 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii) (Rosales, O)
April 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER GRANTING Defendant's 46 Motion for Extension of Time to File Confidential Settlement Conference Statement, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/16/2015. (Kusamura, W)
March 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 44 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 3/11/2015. (Timken, A)
March 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 43 STIPULATION and ORDER to continue Settlement Conference from 3/20/2015 to 4/23/2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/9/2015. (Hernandez, M)
March 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER on the Parties' Informal Dispute re Protective Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 3/5/2015. (Timken, A)
February 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER Extending Dates Set Forth in the Scheduling Order. Non-expert discovery shall be completed by July 15, 2015. Expert disclosures shall be completed by August 26, 2015. Supplemental expert disclosures shall be completed by September 17, 2015. Expert discovery shall be completed by October 23, 2015. Non dispositive motions shall be filed by October 28, 2015, and heard by November 25, 2015. Dispositive motion shall be filed by November 18, 2015, and heard by December 23, 2015. The P retrial conference shall be held on February 17, 2016, at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii. The trial shall commence on April 19, 2016 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 2/12/2015. (Timken, A)
May 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER ; denying 10 Motion to Dismiss signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 5/30/14. (Nazaroff, H)
April 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER on Stipulation Extending Joint Scheduling Conference Deadlines. The Scheduling Conference currently set for 5/1/2014, is CONTINUED to 7/8/2014, at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. The parties' joint scheduling report shall be filed by no later than 7/1/2014. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 4/21/2014. (Timken, A)
March 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Vacating Hearing Date and Taking Matter under Submission signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 03/04/2014. (Flores, E)
October 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER on Ex Parte Notice and Motion to Lift Stay. The stay, entered on October 2, 2013 (Docket No. 6), is LIFTED. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 10/24/2013. (Timken, A)
October 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING 4 Motion to Stay. This action is STAYED until funding for Plaintiff and their attorneys is restored; The hearing on Plaintiff's motion to stay set for October 29, 2013, is VACATED; Plaintiff shall file a notice with the Court within three (3) court days after funding is restored along with a proposed order lifting this stay; and to the extent that any deadlines or dates are affected by the stay, the parties shall file a joint statement within three (3) court days after funding is restored identifying the deadlines and dates affected by the stay along with new proposed deadlines and dates. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 10/1/2013. (Timken, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Farmers Insurance Exchange
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Represented By: Anna Y. Park
Represented By: Rumduol Vuong, GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farmers Insurance Exchange
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?