Morales v. Sherwood, et al.
Plaintiff: Alejandro Jose Morales
Defendant: Hezekiah Sherwood, Greg Coontz, Allen Smith and Nicki Gray
Case Number: 1:2013cv01582
Filed: October 1, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Gary S. Austin
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 75 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that 46 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment Based on Failure to Exhaust Claims be GRANTED and Plaintiff's Case be DISMISSED Without Prejudice re 27 Amended Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 6/20/2016. Referred to Judge Drozd. Objections to F&R due within thirty (30) days. (Jessen, A)
May 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 71 SCHEDULING ORDER Following May 19, 2016 Telephonic Hearing on Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment; ORDER for Defendants to File Further Briefing on Motion for Summary Judgment as Instructed By This Order, Within 21 Days of the May 19, 2016 H earing 46 ; ORDER for Plaintiff to File Briefing in Response to M. Voong's Declaration, as Instructed By This Order, Within 21 Days of the May 19, 2016 Hearing; ORDER for Defendants to Re-Serve M. Voong's Declaration Upon Plaintiff Forthwith [41-4], [41-5], signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 5/27/16. (Hellings, J)
April 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 66 NOTICE of Telephonic Hearing on 46 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 4/21/2016. Telephonic Status Conference set for 5/19/2016 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. (Jessen, A)
February 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER denying 45 Motion to Stay Discovery signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 2/26/2016. (Lundstrom, T)
September 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER DENYING 42 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 9/3/2015. (Jessen, A)
September 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER STRIKING 40 Witness Declarations as Improperly Filed and ORDER for Clerk to Return Original Declarations to Plaintiff signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 9/2/2015. (Jessen, A)
May 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS 31 ; FOR THIS ACTION TO PROCEED WITH THE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT, ON PLAINTIFF'S CLAIMS AGAINST DEFENDANTS SHERWOOD, COONTZ, AND FELIX FOR EXCESSIVE FORCE; AGAINST DEFENDANT SHERWOOD FOR RETALIATION; AND AGAINST DEFENDANT COONTZ FOR FAILURE TO PROTECT PLAINTIFF; AND DISMISSING ALL OTHER CLAIMS AND DEFENDANTS FROM THIS ACTION FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 5/28/2015. (Lundstrom, T)
April 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 31 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that this Case Proceed With the Third Amended Complaint on Certain Claims and that All Other Claims and Defendants be DISMISSED From the Action for Failure to State a Claim, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 4/15/2015. Referred to Judge Ishii. Objections to F&R due within thirty (30) days. (Jessen, A)
February 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER DENYING 28 , 29 Requests to Expedite Case signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 2/20/2015. (Jessen, A)
June 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Denying Motion For Appointment Of Counsel (Document# 20 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 6/19/2014. (Fahrney, E)
March 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER DENYING 15 Plaintiff's Motion for the Court to Serve Copies of Orders in This Case Upon Inmate Melvin Brummet signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 3/26/2014. (Jessen, A)
March 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 14 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS, Recommending that this Action Proceed Against Defendants Sherwood and Coontz for Excessive Force, Against Defendant Coontz for Failure to Protect, and Against Defendant Sherwood for Retaliation, and that All Other Claims and Defendants be Dismissed, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 3/18/14. Twenty-Day Deadline. Referred to Judge Ishii. (Gonzalez, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morales v. Sherwood, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alejandro Jose Morales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hezekiah Sherwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Coontz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allen Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicki Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?