Kaur et al v. Citibank, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Ashwindar Kaur and Indar Jeet Kaur
Defendant: Michael Osuna and Citibank, N.A.
Case Number: 1:2013cv01610
Filed: October 4, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Presiding Judge: Sheila K. Oberto
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING Defendants' 9 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings with Prejudice signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 7/30/2014. CASE CLOSED. (Sant Agata, S)
July 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION and ORDER CONTINUING Scheduling Conference. The Scheduling Conference currently set for 7/29/2014, is CONTINUED to 10/23/2014, at 10:15 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. The parties' joint scheduling report shall be filed by no later than 10/16/2014. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 7/18/2014. (Timken, A)
July 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 7/1/14. (Nazaroff, H)
June 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER directing defendant to file additional briefing signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 6/19/14. (Nazaroff, H)
May 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER vacating hearing date of May 12, 2014 and taking matter under submission signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 5/7/14. (Nazaroff, H)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kaur et al v. Citibank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Osuna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citibank, N.A.
Represented By: Julia B. Strickland
Represented By: Jason S. Yoo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashwindar Kaur
Represented By: David W. Kahn
Represented By: Jan Leslie Kahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Indar Jeet Kaur
Represented By: Jan Leslie Kahn
Represented By: David W. Kahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?