Stuck v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Paul Dean Stuck
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2013cv01615
Filed: October 7, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Barbara A. McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Awarding EAJA Attorney Fees and Expenses Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2412(d) and Costs Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1920 (re (Doc. 16) Stipulation). signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 8/27/2014. (Herman, H)
June 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION and ORDER for Remand Pursuant to Sentence Four of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g), and Request for Entry of Judgment in Favor of Plaintiff and Against Defendant signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 06/02/2014. CASE CLOSED. (Flores, E)
May 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Extending Briefing Schedule: (1) Defendant's Motion for 30-day Extension of Time is GRANTED (Doc. 11 - Stipulation); (2) Defendant shall have up to and including May 26, 2014. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 5/19/2014. (Herman, H)
October 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING 2 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/8/2013. (Marrujo, C)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stuck v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Dean Stuck
Represented By: Lawrence David Rohlfing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Lynn M. Harada, GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?