Felder v. Henson et al
Plaintiff: Anthony E. Felder
Defendant: Henson, Amaro, Hill, Gibson, Kruse, Kuckenbaker, Morgan and Villaba
Case Number: 1:2013cv01622
Filed: October 9, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER AMENDING the Discovery and Scheduling Order, VACATING the Deadline to File Dispositive Motions signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 7/7/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
June 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 72 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/20/2017 recommending that 62 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT be granted. Referred to Judge Anthony W. Ishii; Objections to F&R due within 21-Days. (Lundstrom, T)
April 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OR TO POSTPONE RULING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT 66 AND REQUIRING PLAINTIFF TO FILE A RULE 56(d) MOTION, AN OPPOSITION, OR A STATEMENT OF NON-OPPOSITION signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 4/19/2017. (Filing Deadline: 5/23/2017). (Lundstrom, T)
March 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 SECOND INFORMATIONAL ORDER - NOTICE and Warning of Requirements for Opposing Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/14/2017. 21-day deadline. (Jessen, A)
January 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 60 Request to Schedule a Settlement Conference without Prejudice signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/10/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
December 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER denying 57 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/19/2016. (Lundstrom, T)
November 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER setting responsive pleading deadline re 41 , 45 , 54 signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 11/17/2016. (21-Day Filing Deadline).(Lundstrom, T)
November 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER ADOPTING 45 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION FOR PLAINTIFF TO PROCEED ON COGNIZABLE CLAIMS IN THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT 41 ; DEFENDANTS STARR, HENSON, DR. STOCKWELL, AND DR. LAKSHIMI AND ALL CLAIMS AGAINST THEM ARE DISMISSED AND DENYING PLAINTIFF'S 50 MOTION TO AMEND AND CONSOLIDATE signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 11/14/2016. (Lundstrom, T)
November 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER DENYING 51 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 11/3/2016. (Jessen, A)
March 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 45 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that Plaintiff Proceed on Cognizable Claims in the Second Amended Complaint and that Defendants Starr, Henson, Dr. Stockwell, and Dr. Lakshimi and All Claims Against Them be DISMISSED re 41 Amended Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/11/2016. Referred to Judge Ishii. Objections to F&R due within thirty (30) days. (Jessen, A)
October 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS TO GRANT DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS re 21 , 38 signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 10/16/2015. ( Second Amended Complaint due by 11/23/2015).(Lundstrom, T)
September 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 38 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that 21 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss be GRANTED and Plaintiff be Given Leave to File a Second Amended Complaint re 12 Amended Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 9/11/2015. Referred to Judge Ishii. Objections to F&R due within twenty-one (21) days. (Jessen, A)
September 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 9/8/2015. Lead Case: 1:13-cv-01622-AWI-JLT. Member Case: 1:14-cv-00291-AWI-JLT. MEMBER CASE CLOSED. ALL FUTURE FILINGS TO BE MADE IN LEAD CASE. (Jessen, A)
May 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER Granting Withdrawal of Motion to Dismiss Based on Exhaustion and Denying Motion for Deadline to File Motion for Summary Judgment as Premature 33 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 5/15/14. (Verduzco, M)
March 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER DENYING 26 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/27/2014. (Jessen, A)
March 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Denying 23 Motion to Appoint Counsel, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/18/14. (Verduzco, M)
March 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 22 SECOND INFORMATIONAL ORDER - NOTICE and Warning of Requirements for Opposing Defendants' Motion to Dismiss 21 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/11/14. (Verduzco, M)
January 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER DENYING 18 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/14/2014. (Sant Agata, S)
November 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER DENYING 10 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 11/5/2013. (Sant Agata, S)
October 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DENYING 8 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/24/2013. (Jessen, A)
October 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DENYING 3 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/10/2013. (Jessen, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Felder v. Henson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony E. Felder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kruse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kuckenbaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Villaba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?