Ahdom v. Etchebehere et al
Plaintiff: Bilal Ahdom
Defendant: C. Etchebehere, F. Cote and California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation
Case Number: 1:2013cv01623
Filed: October 9, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Gary S. Austin
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER DENYING 70 Request to File Reply signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 10/27/17. (Sant Agata, S)
August 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that 44 Defendant Etchebehere's Motion for Summary Judgment be GRANTED re 24 Amended Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 8/20/2017. Referred to Judge Drozd. Objections to F&R due within fourteen (14) days. (Jessen, A)
July 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER GRANTING Defendant's Motion to Strike 58 ; ORDER STRIKING Plaintiff's May 5, 2017, Response as an Improper Surreply 57 , signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 7/24/17. (Hellings, J)
July 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER vacating 49 Motions in Limine from Court's Calendar signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 7/5/2017. (Lundstrom, T)
October 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER setting Settlement Conference before U.S. Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on November 4, 2016 at California Substance Abuse Treatment Facility (start time to be determined at a future date) signed by District Judge Ralph R. Beistline on 10/25/2016. (Lundstrom, T)
August 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting 38 Motion for extension of time within which to make initial disclosures signed by District Judge Ralph R. Beistline on 8/31/2016. (Lundstrom, T)
June 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER RE: Motion to Dismiss 29 , signed by District Judge Ralph R. Beistline on 6/9/16: Motion is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. (Hellings, J)
April 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER/NOTICE RE: Motion to Dismiss, signed by District Judge Ralph R. Beistline on 4/28/16. (Hellings, J)
April 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 17 DISMISSAL ORDER, signed by Chief Judge Ralph R. Beistline on 4/20/2015. Amended Complaint Due by 6/8/2015. (Marrujo, C)
February 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER VACATING 11 Findings and Recommendations of February 4, 2014 signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 2/18/2014. (Sant Agata, S)
February 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 11 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that this Action be DISMISSED Without Prejudice Based on Plaintiff's Failure to Comply With Court Orders re 1 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 2/4/2014. Referred to Judge Ishii. Objections to F&R due within thirty (30) days. (Jessen, A)
November 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Adopting 8 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION; ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 3 Motion for Preliminary Injunctive Relief signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 11/20/2013. (Sant Agata, S)
October 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 8 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that 3 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunctive Relief be DENIED, Without Prejudice to Renewal of the Motion at a Later Stage of the Proceedings re 1 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 10/11/2013. Referred to Judge Ishii. Objections to F&R due within twenty (20) days. (Jessen, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ahdom v. Etchebehere et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bilal Ahdom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Etchebehere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F. Cote
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?