Kneeland v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Tod Eric Kneeland
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2013cv01774
Filed: November 1, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Stanley A. Boone
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER Awarding Equal Access to Justice Act Attorney Fees and Expenses. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/22/2015. (Hernandez, M)
April 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER RE: Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney's Fees, Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/21/2015. (Arellano, S.)
December 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER on Stipulation for Remand Pursuant to Sentence Four of 42 U.S.C. 405(g), and for Entry of Judgment in Favor of Plaintiff and Against Defendant, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/4/2014. CASE CLOSED. (Marrujo, C)
December 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER that on or before 12/10/2014 plaintiff shall file a notice informing the Court whether it consents to defendant's motion to remand or whether it opposes remand. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/1/2014. (Hernandez, M)
November 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER DISCHARGING 21 Order to Show Cause, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/4/2014. (Marrujo, C)
November 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER requiring defendant to show cause why sanctions should not issue for failure to comply with Court order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/31/2014. (Hernandez, M)
September 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER discharging Order to Show Cause and Granting Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/23/2014. (Hernandez, M)
September 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Order requiring Plaintiff to show cause why this action should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/11/2014. Show Cause Response due by 9/22/2014.(Figueroa, O)
July 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION and ORDER to extend briefing schedule. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/28/2014. (Hernandez, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kneeland v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tod Eric Kneeland
Represented By: Steven Gilbert Rosales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Patrick William Snyder, GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?