Berschneider v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Rocklin J. Berschneider , II
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2013cv01945
Filed: December 1, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Stanislaus
Presiding Judge: Gary S. Austin
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER Granting 25 Motion for Attorney Fees signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 12/08/2016. (Flores, E)
June 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STIPULATION and ORDER for EAJA Fees, Costs, and Expenses re 23 signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 6/9/2015. (Martinez, A)
March 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Regarding Plaintiff's Social Security Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 3/31/15. CASE CLOSED. (Verduzco, M)
September 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Stipulation and Order extending time for Defendant to file her responsive brief, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 9/9/2014. (Response Brief due by 10/10/2014) (Figueroa, O)
December 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Granting 3 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 12/03/2013. (Flores, E)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Berschneider v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rocklin J. Berschneider , II
Represented By: Jacqueline Anna Forslund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Armand D. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?