Pontius v. Internal Revenue Service et al
Petitioner: David Pontius
Respondent: JP Morgan Chase Bank N.A., Bank of America, N.A., Nelson Valdez and Internal Revenue Service
Case Number: 1:2013mc00056
Filed: November 14, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
Presiding Judge: Stanley A. Boone
Nature of Suit: Other

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER DENYING 25 Petitioner's Motion to Alter or Amend the Judgment, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 4/23/2014. (Kusamura, W)
February 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Findings and Recommendations recommending denying Petitioner's 12 Amended Petition to Quash Summons, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/18/2014. Matter was referred to Judge Ishii. Objections to F&R due by 3/7/2014. (Figueroa, O)
January 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER VACATING February 19, 2014 Hearing, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/29/2014. (Marrujo, C)
January 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Granting Petitioner's 5 Motion to File Amended Petition to Quash Summons signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 01/06/2014. (Flores, E)
November 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER REQUIRING Petitioner to Properly Serve and Notice Hearing Within Fourteen Days, Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/19/2013. (Arellano, S.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pontius v. Internal Revenue Service et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: JP Morgan Chase Bank N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Bank of America, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Nelson Valdez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Internal Revenue Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: David Pontius
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?