Hill v. CDCR, et al.
Plaintiff: Tony Lee Hill
Defendant: Ayala, Nieto, Katavich, CDCR, Cook, - Salgado and Alcala
Case Number: 1:2014cv00002
Filed: January 2, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Gary S. Austin
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER DISMISSING ACTION, Without Prejudice, for Failure to Pay Filing Fee; ORDER for Clerk to CLOSE CASE, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 4/11/2014. CASE CLOSED. (Marrujo, C)
March 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER Denying 33 Motion for Reconsideration, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 3/24/14. (Verduzco, M)
March 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Revoking Plaintiff's in Forma Pauperis Status Under 28 USC 1915(g); ORDER Vacating Order of January 10, 2014 7 ; ORDER Requiring Plaintiff to Pay $400.00 Filing Fee in Full within Thirty Days or this Case will be Dismissed; ORDER for Clerk to Serve this Order on CDCR and Financial Department, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 3/5/14. (Verduzco, M)
February 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER DENYING 21 Motion for Change of Venue and ORDER DENYING 3 , 12 , 18 Plaintiff's Motions for Transfer and for Court to Obtain Video signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 2/14/2014. (Jessen, A)
February 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Granting Motion To Amend (Doc. 16 ), ORDER Directing Clerk To File Second Amended Complaint Lodged On February 3, 2014 (Doc. 17 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 2/5/2014. (Fahrney, E)
January 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER denying 13 Request for free copy of first amended complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 1/22/2014. (Lundstrom, T)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hill v. CDCR, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ayala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nieto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katavich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CDCR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: - Salgado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alcala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tony Lee Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?