Meador v. Aye et al
Plaintiff: Gordon D. Meador
Defendant: K. Aye, Gill, Clark, Wang, Nguyen, Kim and Sellers
Case Number: 1:2014cv00006
Filed: January 2, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Dennis L. Beck
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER re 170 Letter, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 4/4/18. (Gonzalez, R)
January 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER DIRECTING the Clerk of Court to Close the Case with prejudice(Stipulation), signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 01/16/18. CASE CLOSED(Martin-Gill, S)
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 160 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Dismiss Claims Consistent with Magistrate Judge's Prior Order in Light of Williams Decision signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 12/05/2017. Referred to Judge Drozd; Objections to F&R due by 12/26/2017.(Flores, E)
December 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER & WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM TO TRANSPORT GORDON DALE MEADOR, CDCR# C-57959, PLAINTIFF on January 3, 2018 at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom #25, United States Courthouse, 501 I Street, Sacramento, California, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 12/4/17. (Martin-Gill, S)
December 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 152 Motion for an Order Directing Librarian Lindquist to Provide Plaintiff with Legal Supplies that are Needed for Litigation, without Prejudice signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 12/1/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
September 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER ADOPTING 142 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 09/27/2017. (Flores, E)
August 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 142 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending That Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment be Granted In Part and Denied In Part; ORDER DENYING Defendants' 114 Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Response to Reply to Defendants' Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 8/29/17. Objections to F&R Due Within Twenty One Days. (Marrujo, C)
June 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 132 Motion Requesting an Order Issue to Defense Counsel to Contact her Extended Client to Release Plaintiff's Property signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 06/20/2017. (Flores, E)
April 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER DENYING 128 Plaintiff's Motion for Court to Contact FBI signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 4/24/2017. (Jessen, A)
April 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER on Plaintiff's 122 Motion to Clarify the Record, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 4/6/17. (Gonzalez, R)
March 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER Allowing Defendants to File a Supplemental Summary Judgment Motion,signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 03/29/17. (21-Day Deadline) (Martin-Gill, S)
March 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER GRANTING 118 Motion to Withdraw, ORDER WITHDRAWING 116 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; ORDER VACATING 117 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 03/7/17. (Martin-Gill, S)
February 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 117 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending that Plaintiff's 116 Motion for a Preliminary Injunction be Denied signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 02/27/2017. Referred to Judge Drozd; Objections to F&R due by 3/23/2017.(Flores, E)
January 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 112 SUPPLEMENT to ORDER on Plaintiff's Motion for Appointment of Pro Bono Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 01/13/2017. (Flores, E)
December 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER DENYING 102 Plaintiff's Motion for Appointment of Pro Bono Counsel; ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff Sixty (60) Days to File a Response to Defendants' Summary Judgment Motion; ORDER Requiring Response From the Office of the Attorney Genera l Regarding Access to the Law Library Within Fourteen (14) Days signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 12/16/2016. Clerk to serve this order and a copy of Plainiff's Motion for Appointment of Pro Bono Counsel on Supervising Deputy Attorney General Monica Anderson. (Jessen, A)
December 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Request for Status Update signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 12/02/2016. (Flores, E)
October 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER to Treat Motions for Injunctive Relief as Withdrawn 58 59 64 65 68 71 73 80 87 90 ; ORDER Vacating Findings and Recommendations 74 85 , signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 10/31/16. (Verduzco, M)
September 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER Requiring Additional Information Regarding Request for Withdraw Injunction Request signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 09/23/2016. (Flores, E)
August 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 85 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that 58 , 59 , 64 , 65 , 73 , 80 Plaintiff's Motions for Preliminary Injunctive Relief be DENIED re 30 Amended Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 8/9/2016. Referred to Judge Drozd. Objections to F&R due within thirty (30) days. (Jessen, A)
July 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER on Stipulation to Dismiss With Prejudice Defendant Richard Smith, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 7/21/16. (Marrujo, C)
July 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER Regarding Plaintiff's 76 78 Request for Status of Case signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 07/06/2016. (Flores, E)
June 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 74 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Motions for Temporary Restraining Orders 68 & 71 , signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 6/24/16. Objections to F&R Due Within Thirty Days. (Marrujo, C)
May 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER DENYING 63 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 5/18/16. (Marrujo, C)
May 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 61 NOTICE of this Expedited Trial Setting Procedures upon Consent of all Parties signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 05/04/2016. (Flores, E)
February 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 46 Motion for an Order Directing Defendants to File an Answer signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 2/26/2016. (Sant Agata, S)
February 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER DENYING 44 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 2/24/2016. (Sant Agata, S)
December 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER FINDING Certain Claims Cognizable and DISMISSING Certain Claims and Defendants signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 12/22/2015. (Sant Agata, S)
October 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 10/27/2015. (Sant Agata, S)
May 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's 24 Application to Amend the Briefing Schedule for the Filing of the Amended Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 5/5/2015. (Sant Agata, S)
March 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 3/25/2015 ORDERING plaintiff's attorney's request for authority to incur costs by appointed pro bono counsel Brian McComas is GRANTED. (Crouch, J)
March 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Denying 20 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 3/20/15. (Verduzco, M)
February 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Clarifying Deadline For Filing Amended Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 2/11/2015. (First Amended Complaint due by 5/14/2015) (Fahrney, E)
February 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Appointing Limited Purpose Counsel, ORDER Extending Time For Filing Amended Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 2/11/2015. Attorney Brian Curtis McComas for Gordon D. Meador added. (Fahrney, E)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Meador v. Aye et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gordon D. Meador
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Aye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nguyen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sellers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?