Gonzalez v. Harris Ranch Beef Company et al
Plaintiff: Jose Gonzalez
Defendant: Harris Ranch Beef Company and Harris Ranch Beef Holding Company
Case Number: 1:2014cv00038
Filed: January 10, 2014
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Stanley A. Boone
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER DISMISSING third-party complaint, with prejudice. Order signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 11/13/2015. (Rooney, M)
November 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 77 Stipulation and ORDER to Dismiss Plaintiff's Claims with Prejudice, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 11/5/15. CASE CLOSED. (Verduzco, M)
September 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER RE FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS 64 , 68 , 73 , signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 9/3/15.(Hellings, J)
August 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 73 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that 64 the MOTION for FINAL APPROVAL and MOTION for Attorneys' Fees be DENIED. The matter is referred to Judge O'Neill; Objections due within 14 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/19/2015. (Hernandez, M)
May 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 66 STIPULATION and ORDER to Continue the Filing deadline for and Hearing Date of the Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement. Motion Hearing is set moved to 8/19/2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/12/2015. (Kusamura, W)
March 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER Adopting Findings And Recommendations (ECF No. 58 , 61 ), signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 3/25/2015. The February 23, 2015 Findings and Recommendations are ADOPTED IN FULL (ECF No. 61 ). Plaintiffs motion for preliminary a pproval of class action settlement is GRANTED (ECF No. 58 ). A Final Approval Hearing is set for July 22, 2015 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before United States Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. On or before July 8, 2015, Plaintiffs shall file a motion for final approval of class action settlement.(Fahrney, E)
February 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 61 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that 58 MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT BE GRANTED. The matter is referred to Judge O'Neill. Objections due within 14 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/23/2015. (Hernandez, M)
January 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER GRANTING 59 Stipulation to Stay Proceedings Related to Third Party Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/26/2015. (Marrujo, C)
January 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 57 Stipulation and Order to continue the filing deadline for and hearing date for the Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/13/2015. (Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement filed by 2/11/2015; Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement Hearing set for 2/25/2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone) (Figueroa, O)
December 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER that the parties shall file their motion for preliminary approval of class action settlement on or before 1/14/2015. The matter will be heard on 1/28/2015 at 10:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/16/2014. (Hernandez, M)
December 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER on Motion to Dismiss 27 , signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 12/9/14. (Verduzco, M)
December 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 49 Stipulation and ORDER for Amended Caption to Conform With Court's Prior Order of Dismissal, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 12/2/2014. (Marrujo, C)
November 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER for Supplemental Briefing, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 11/5/14. (Hellings, J)
October 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER GRANTING THIRD-PARTY DEFENDANT REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF PAGE LIMITS 42 signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on October 6, 2014. (Munoz, I)
August 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 34 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 8/19/2014 modifying briefing schedule re 27 MOTION to DISMISS. (Opposition Filing Deadline: 9/15/2014; Reply Filing Deadline: 9/29/201; Motion Hearing reset for 10/6/2014 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill). (Lundstrom, T)
August 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Stipulation and ORDER to Modify Briefing Schedule, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 8/5/14. Motion Hearing set for 9/11/2014 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill.(Verduzco, M)
June 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATION and ORDER for defendant Harris Farms, Inc to file cross-complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/3/2014. (Hernandez, M)
June 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Stipulation and order for Defendant Harris Farms, Inc. to file Cross Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 05/30/2014. (Cross Complaint filed by 6/20/2014) (Figueroa, O)
February 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION and ORDER to Substitute in Harris Farms, Inc. as Doe 1 and to Dismiss Defendants Harris Ranch Beef Company and Harris Ranch Beef Holding Company without Prejudice, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 2/11/14. (Verduzco, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gonzalez v. Harris Ranch Beef Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harris Ranch Beef Company
Represented By: Meagan Daurese Christiansen
Represented By: Alden John Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harris Ranch Beef Holding Company
Represented By: Meagan Daurese Christiansen
Represented By: Alden John Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Gonzalez
Represented By: Daniel Franklin Gaines
Represented By: Alex Paul Katofsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?