Bullock v. Wasco State Prison Medical

Plaintiff: Gordon Bullock
Defendant: Wasco State Prison Medical
Case Number: 1:2014cv00092
Filed: January 22, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Gary S. Austin
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 114 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS that Plaintiff's First Amendment Retaliation Claim be Dismissed Pursuant to Rule 41 and that this Action be Dismissed for Plaintiff's Failure to Exhaust his Administrative Remedies; Objections, if any, Due in Fourteen (14) Days signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 8/29/2018. Referred to Judge Dale A. Drozd. (Sant Agata, S)
June 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER Regarding Petitioner's 110 Motion Requesting Copies, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 6/19/18. (Gonzalez, R)
May 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 107 NOTICE and ORDER That Inmate Witness Gordon Bullock is No Longer Needed as Witness in These Proceedings and the Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum is Discharged signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 5/21/2018. (Jessen, A)
April 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER & WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM to Transport Gordon Bulluck on May 17, 2018 at 10:00 a.m. for an Evidentiary Hearing signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 4/20/2018. (Sant Agata, S)
April 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER denying 95 Motion for Extension of Time signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 4/6/2018. (Lundstrom, T)
April 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER adopting FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS denying MOTION and referring matter to Magistrate Judge 80 , 85 signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 4/3/2018. (Lundstrom, T)
March 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER adopting 84 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION, granting in part and denying in part 62 Motion for Summary Judgment, denying 78 Motion for Summary Judgment and referring matter back to Magistrate Judge for evidentiary hearing signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 3/28/2018. (Lundstrom, T)
March 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER Following Discovery and Status Conference signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 3/14/2018. Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 4/6/2018. Evidentiary Hearing set for 5/17/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. (Jessen, A)
March 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 85 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Plaintiff's 80 Request for Injunctive Relief; Objections, if any, Due within Twenty-One (21) Days; ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 80 Request for a Criminal Investigation signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 2/28/2018. Referred to Judge Dale A. Drozd. (Sant Agata, S)
February 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 84 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS that Plaintiff's 78 Motion for Summary Judgment be Denied and that Defendants' 62 Motion for Summary Judgment be Granted in Part and Denied in Part; Objections Due within Twenty-One (21) Days signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 2/27/2018. Referred to Judge Dale A. Drozd. (Sant Agata, S)
January 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER adopting 76 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS and denying Plaintiffs' Motions for Preliminary injunctive relief 54 , 55 , 60 , 65 , 68 signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 1/30/2018. (Lundstrom, T)
October 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 74 Motions to Compel Discovery, and Granting Plaintiff's Request to, in Effect, File Sur-Reply signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 10/20/2017. (Flores, E)
May 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER RE: Clarification on Administrative Exhaustion, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 05/03/2017. (Martin-Gill, S)
April 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER UPDATING DOCKET AND FOR ASSIGNMENT OF DISTRICT JUDGE RE 39 signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 4/11/2017. Case randomly assigned to District Judge Dale A. Drozd. The new case number is 1:14-cv-00092-DAD-EPG-(PC). (Lundstrom, T)
March 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER DENYING 45 Plaintiff's Second Motion to Compel Access to Law Library signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 3/10/2017. (Jessen, A)
March 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER denying 41 Motion to compel access to law library and for legal copying signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 3/2/17. (Lundstrom, T)
January 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER denying 35 Motion to Appoint Counsel and 36 Request for Initial Disclosures signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 1/17/2017. (Lundstrom, T)
October 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting 27 Motion for Extension of Time and for Clerk to send Plaintiff copy of fourth amended complaint filed 5/16/2016 re 28 signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 10/5/2016. (Filing Deadline: 11/21/2016). (Lundstrom, T)
August 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER DIRECTING Clerk to File Third Amended Complaint Lodged on July 16, 2015, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 8/20/15. (Marrujo, C)
July 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER DENYING 18 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 7/23/2015. (Jessen, A)
May 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO AMEND THE COMPLAINT AND DIRECTING CLERK TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT LODGED ON DECEMBER 19, 2014 re 14 signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 5/28/2015. (Lundstrom, T)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bullock v. Wasco State Prison Medical
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gordon Bullock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wasco State Prison Medical
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?