Washington et al v. Fresno County Sheriff et al
Plaintiff: Perry Washington and Athonia Washington
Defendant: Fresno County Sheriff and Fresno County District Attorney
Case Number: 1:2014cv00129
Filed: January 29, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Stanley A. Boone
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER DIRECTING Clerk of Court to Administratively TERMINATE 160 Motion for Reconsideration and Forward to Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/30/2018. (Sant Agata, S)
May 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER GRANTING Counsel's Motion to Withdraw as Attorney 145 , 148 ; MEMORANDUM Decision GRANTING Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment Following Evidentiary Hearing, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/11/2018: The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to close this action. (CASE CLOSED)(Hellings, J)
April 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER Granting Request to Shorten Time and Vacating All Dates in this Matter, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/20/2018. It is hereby ordered that: (1) Any opposition to the motion to withdraw shall be filed on or before May 4, 2018 ; (2) A hearing on the motion to withdraw is set for May 11, 2018, at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 9; (3) All pending dates are VACATED to allow for decision on the motion to withdraw; and (4) Plaintiff's counsel shall serve a copy of this order, and the motion to withdraw as counsel, including the declaration in support of the motion to be relieved, on Plaintiff and file a proof of service on or before April 25, 2018. (Valdez, E)
April 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 144 SECOND AMENDED ORDER Scheduling Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/12/2018: Pretrial Conference May 1, 2018 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 9; Motions in Limine filing: May 3, 2018; Response to Motion in Limine: May 10, 2018; Motion in Limine Hearing: May 15, 2018 at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom 9; Trial remains for May 22, 2018, at 8:30 a.m. in Courtroom 9. (Hellings, J)
April 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER Vacating Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum to Transport Inmate Perry Washington signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 04/05/2018. (Flores, E)
March 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 141 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/20/2018: The pretrial conference is CONTINUED from April 6, 2018, to April 20, 2018, at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 9 (SAB); Motions in limine shall be filed on or befor e April 27, 2018; Oppositions to motions in limine shall be filed on or before May 4, 2018; The hearing on motions in limine hearing is continued from May 2, 2018, to May 15, 2018, at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom 9 (SAB); and The trial shall remain for May 22, 2018 at 8:30 a.m. in Courtroom 9 (SAB). (Hellings, J)
March 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 140 AMENDED ORDER & WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM to Transport Inmate Perry Washington, CDCR #BB3202 on April 10, 2018 at 8:00 AM, Courtroom 9 (SAB), signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/12/2018. (Hellings, J)
March 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER & WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM to Transport Inmate Perry Washington, CDCR# BB3202 at 4/10/2018 at 8:00 a.m., Courtroom 9 (SAB), signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/23/2018. (Hellings, J)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER REGARDING Procedures Related to Evidentiary Hearing on Exhaustion signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/21/2018. (Sant Agata, S)
January 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER AMENDING Scheduling Order signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/11/2018. Jury Trial set for 5/22/2018 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. (Sant Agata, S)
December 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER Following Case Management Conference signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/21/2017. Pretrial Conference set for 4/6/2018 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone; Filing Deadline on Motion in Limine: 4/18/2018; Response due by 4/25/2018; Motion in Limine set for 5/2/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone; Jury Trial set for 5/15/2018 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone.(Flores, E)
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER denying Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment 114 , 122 , 123 signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/6/2017. Case Management Conference set for 12/21/2017 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. (Lundstrom, T)
December 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER vacating December 6, 2017 hearing signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/4/2017. (Lundstrom, T)
November 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER Re Stipulation to Continue Reply Deadline and Continuing Oral Argument on Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment to December 6, 2017, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/20/2017: 1. Defendant Velos' reply shall be filed on or before December 1, 2017; and 2. The hearing set for November 29, 2017, is continued to December 6, 2017, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 9. (Hellings, J)
November 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER requiring Plaintiff to comply with Local Rule 260 and the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and striking Plaintiff's responses to Defendants' requests for admission and interrogatories signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/16/2017. (Filing Deadline: 11/20/2017). (Lundstrom, T)
November 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER Requiring Defendant to File Amended Consent Form Within Five Days 102 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/13/17. (Hellings, J)
September 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER re Stipulation to Amend Scheduling Order; Dispositive Motion Deadline is AMENDED to October 9, 2017, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 09/1/17. ( Dispositive Motions filed by 10/9/2017,) (Martin-Gill, S)
June 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER AMENDING SCHEDULING ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: Plaintiff shall ensure that the statement of undisputed facts is received by Defendant on or before August 25, 2017; The deadline for Defendant to file a dispositive motion, including for fa ilure to exhaust administrative remedies, is amended to September 15, 2017; The pre-trial conference date and trial date are VACATED and will be re-set after the dispositive motion is decided; and All other aspects of the November 7, 2016 scheduling order shall remain in effect. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/28/2017. (Hernandez, M)
May 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER re Stipulation for Modification of Scheduling Order signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/5/2017. Plaintiff's Response to Discovery Requests due by 6/2/2017. Defendants' Dispositive Motion due by 6/30/2017. (Jessen, A)
March 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER AMENDING NOVEMBER 7, 2016 SCHEDULING ORDER PURSUANT TO STIPULATION OF THE PARTIES signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/2/2017. It is hereby ordered that the November 7, 2016 scheduling order is amended as follows: The deadline to conduct non-expert discovery shall be May 8, 2017; and all other aspects of the November 7, 2016 scheduling order remain in effect. (Valdez, E)
February 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER VACATING FEBRUARY 23, 2017 SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/21/2017. (Hernandez, M)
October 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to redesignate action as Prisoner Civil Rights signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/13/2016. (Lundstrom, T)
April 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 97 STIPULATION and ORDER to continue Scheduling Conference to 11/1/2016 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. The parties shall file their joint scheduling report seven days prior to the new scheduling conference date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/21/2016. (Hernandez, M)
April 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Requests for an Exparte Hearing and Issuance of a Preliminary Injunction (Docs. 79 90 ), signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 4/5/2015. (Gaumnitz, R)
April 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER LIFTING STAY, DENYING 80 Motion for Extension of Time, APPOINTING Counsel, and DIRECTING the Clerk of the Court to Issue Regular Civil Initial Case Documents signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/4/2016. (Sant Agata, S)
February 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER VACATING DATES and STAYING ACTION,signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 02/17/2016. Case stayed (Martin-Gill, S)
February 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER Requiring Defendant to File a Response to 80 MOTION to Amend the Scheduling Order Within Seven Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/11/16. Seven-Day Deadline. (Gonzalez, R)
February 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER Denying 77 Plaintiff's Request for Change of Mailing Address, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/5/16. (Gonzalez, R)
July 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER DISREGARDING 74 Power of Attorney signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/22/2015. (Jessen, A)
June 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 73 Order DENYING Plaintiff's 72 Motion for Default and Motion for Default Judgment, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/11/2015. (Rosales, O)
June 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER DISCHARGING 66 Order to Show Cause and Directing Clerk's Office to Issue Discovery and Scheduling Order; ORDERED Clerk to Issue First Informational Order and Discovery and Scheduling Order in a prisoner civil rights case, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 06/09/2015. (Martin-Gill, S)
May 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER Requiring Plaintiff to Either Show Cause Why this Action Should Not Be Dismissed for Failure to Prosecute or a Motion for Entry of Default Within Thirty Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/28/15. Show Cause Response Due Within Thirty Days. (Gonzalez, R)
March 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER re 63 Notice of Submission of Documents, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 03/12/15. Clerk to Send Service Documents to USM. (Gonzalez, R)
January 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER Striking Notices of Addresses for Service;the full name and current address of Defendant Doe for purposes of service in this action, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 01/26/2015. (20-Day Deadline) (Martin-Gill, S)
January 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER Denying 53 Motion for Extension of Time as Moot and Disregarding 52 Request Filed December 30, 2014, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/5/15. (Verduzco, M)
December 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER REQUIRING plaintiff to furnish further information for initiation of service of process, document 50 , to be submitted to the Court within thirty days of service of this Order. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/23/2014. (Rooney, M)
December 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 49 Order STRIKING request to proceed as nonresponsive, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/3/2014. (Amended Complaint due by 12/23/2014) (Figueroa, O)
November 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER Denying Motion For Appointment Of Counsel (ECF No. 45 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/31/2014. (Fahrney, E)
October 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER DENYING 44 Request for Appointment of Counsel and Granting Plaintiff's Request for an Extension of Time signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/30/2014. Plaintiff shall either notify the Court that he wishes to proceed on those claims found to be cognizable or file an amended complaint within thirty (30) days. (Jessen, A)
September 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER Adopting in Part the Magistrate Judge's 26 Findings and Recommendations; ORDER Dismissing in Part Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, Dismissing Anthonia Washington as a Plaintiff, Denying Plaintiff's Request for Investigator, Denying Plaintiff's Request to Proceed as a Class Action, and Denying Plaintiff's Request for Transfer to Federal Custody, re 16 , 26 , 39 , signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 09/23/14. Anthonia Washington terminated. (Gonzalez, R)
July 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER DENYING 38 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/29/2014. (Sant Agata, S)
July 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER DENYING 36 Plaintiff's Motion to File Electronically signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/9/2014. (Jessen, A)
May 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER Striking 32 Unsigned Motion for Injunctive Relief, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 05/14/14. The Office of the Clerk is DIRECTED not to file any further requests for relief filed by Anthonia Washington or Peryna Washington. (Gonzalez, R)
April 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER AMENDING 26 Findings and Recommendations, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 04/09/14. (Gonzalez, R)
April 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 26 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Dismissing Certain Defendants re 11 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/7/14. Referred to Judge Ishii. Thirty-Day Deadline. (Gonzalez, R)
April 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Denying 18 Request For Injunctive Relief, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 4/4/2014. (Gaumnitz, R)
April 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Striking First Amended Complaint (ECF No. 11 ), ORDER Denying Request Not To Strike Original Complaint; And Request For Continuance (ECF No. 19 , 20 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/2/2014. (Fahrney, E)
February 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff Anthonia Washington's Motion for Reconsideration and Motion to Send Investigator to Fresno County Jail as to 8 and 9 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 02/21/2014. (Martin-Gill, S)
February 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Dismissing 6 Complaint, with leave to amend, for failure to state a claim and DENYING Plaintiff's 5 Motions, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/18/2014. Amended Complaint due by 3/24/2014. (Figueroa, O)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Washington et al v. Fresno County Sheriff et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Perry Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Athonia Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fresno County Sheriff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fresno County District Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?