Quiroga v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Cynthia M Quiroga
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2014cv00152
Filed: February 5, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Sheila K. Oberto
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Administratively Closing Case, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 11/20/14: Case Closed pursuant to parties' Rule 41 Stipulation. (CASE CLOSED)(Hellings, J)
November 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER that Plaintiff file an opening brief or show cause why the action should not be dismissed. By no later than 11/19/2014, Plaintiff shall either file an opening brief or show cause why this action should not be dismissed for failure to comply with the Court's briefing order. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 11/19/2014. (Timken, A)
October 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER EXTENDING Briefing Schedule. Plaintiff shall file an opening brief on or before November 15, 2014; Defendant shall file a responsive brief on or before December 19, 2014; and Plaintiff may file an optional reply brief on or before January 3, 2014. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 10/7/2014. (Timken, A)
February 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING 2 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 2/6/2014. (Jessen, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quiroga v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Francesco Paulo Benavides, GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia M Quiroga
Represented By: Brian C. Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?