Salazar v. Kokor et al
Plaintiff: Efrain Salazar
Defendant: Kokor, California Health Care Department of Corrections and State of California
Case Number: 1:2014cv00211
Filed: February 18, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Seng
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER FOLLOWING SETTLEMENT; VACATING Dates and DIRECTING Parties to File Dispositive Documents within Fourteen Days signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/27/2018. (Sant Agata, S)
February 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER that Efrain Salazar, CDCR# K-50730, is no longer Needed as a Participant in these Proceedings, and the Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum is DISCHARGED signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/27/2018. (Sant Agata, S)
January 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER DENYING 50 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 1/19/2018. (Jessen, A)
January 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER Adopting 47 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS and DISMISSING Certain Claims signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 1/10/2018. (Sant Agata, S)
December 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER Rescheduling Settlement Conference from January 11, 2018 to February 27, 2017 at 10:30a.m., signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/14/17. Settlement Conference set for 2/27/2018 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. (Gonzalez, R)
December 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to dismiss non-cognizable claima re 18 signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 12/1/2017. Referred to Judge Anthony W. Ishii; Objections to F&R due within 14-Days. (Lundstrom, T)
October 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER SETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 10/7/2017. Settlement Conference set for 1/11/2018 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. (Jessen, A)
September 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER Adopting 41 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS; ORDER GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART Defendant's 32 Motion for Summary Judgment; Case to Remain Open signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 9/18/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
July 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that 32 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment be GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART re 18 Amended Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 7/12/2017. Referred to Judge Ishii. Objections to F&R due within fourteen (14) days. (Jessen, A)
November 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER REQUIRING Plaintiff to File Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment; NOTICE and WARNING of Requirements for Opposing Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 11/21/16. Twenty-One Day Deadline. (Marrujo, C)
March 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER DENYING 30 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 3/10/2016. (Jessen, A)
June 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER discharging 14 Order to Show Cause and granting 15 Motion for Extension of Time to file amended complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 6/11/2015. (Amended Complaint due by 8/14/2015).(Lundstrom, T)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Salazar v. Kokor et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Efrain Salazar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kokor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Health Care Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?