Richardson v. Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. et al
Plaintiff: James Richardson
Defendant: Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. and THD At-Home Services, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2014cv00273
Filed: February 27, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Barbara A. McAuliffe
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER REGARDING (1) Plaintiff's Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and (2) Plaintiff's Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees, Costs, and Class Representative Enhancement Award, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/5/16. (Marrujo, C)
February 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER GRANTING 21 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend the Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 2/3/2015. Second Amended Complaint due within five (5) days. Status Conference set for 4/2/2015 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. (Jessen, A)
January 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 25 STIPULATION and ORDER to Amend Preliminary Scheduling Order (Motion Doc. 22): The Court, having read and considered the Stipulation to Amend Preliminary Scheduling Order and having reviewed the Courts calendar and due to the press of business, finds good cause to continue dates as follows: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the dates set forth in the Preliminary Scheduling Order shall be continued as follows: 1) Discovery Cutoff for Class Certification issues (non-expert): September 30, 2015; 2) Expert Disclosure: October 16, 2015; 3) Expert Discovery Cutoff : January 15, 2016; 4) Class Certification Filing Deadline: January 22, 2016; 5) Class certification opposition: Six (6) weeks after opening brief; 6) Class Certification Reply: Three (3) weeks after opposition brief. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/20/2015. (Herman, H)
August 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Stipulated PROTECTIVE ORDER Governing Discovery, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 8/1/2014. (Herman, H)
June 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Granting Stipulation (Doc. 9) for Leave to File First Amended Class Action Complaint for Damages and Injunctive Relief: (1) Plaintiff shall file and serve (by electronic service) his First Amended Class Action Complaint for Damages and Injunct ive Relief within ten (10) days of the entry of this order; (2) The Answer previously filed by Defendant to Plaintiff's Class Action Complaint for Damages and Injunctive Relief shall be deemed as the Answer to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint if no other responsive pleading is filed by Defendant within 30 days after service of the First Amended Class Action Complaint for Damages and Injunctive Relief. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 6/13/2014. (Herman, H)
June 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER, Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 6/6/2014: Deadline to amend pleadings or file stipulated amendment: July 1, 2014; Discovery cutoff for class certification issues (non-expert): January 30, 2015; Expert disclosure: February 13, 2015; Expert discovery cutoff: April 25, 2015; Class certification motion filing deadline: March 13, 2015; Class certification opposition: Six (6) weeks after opening brief; Class Certification Reply: Three (3) weeks after opposition brief. A hearing on Plaintiffs motion for class certification will be held no earlier than two (2) weeks after the reply brief is filed. (Arellano, S.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richardson v. Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Richardson
Represented By: Kenneth Yoon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: Liz Kathryn Bertko
Represented By: Donna M Mezias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THD At-Home Services, Inc.
Represented By: Liz Kathryn Bertko
Represented By: Donna M Mezias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?