Endsley v. Travelers Property Casualty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: L. Stephen Endsley
Defendant: Travelers Property Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2014cv00346
Filed: March 11, 2014
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Stanislaus
Presiding Judge: Gary S. Austin
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER DISMISSING ACTION with Prejudice signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 11/16/2015. CASE CLOSED.(Flores, E)
August 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER Approving In Part Stipulation to Extend Expert Discovery and Filing of Dispositive Motions signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 8/25/2015. (Martinez, A)
June 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER Approving Stipulation to Extend Expert Discovery signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 6/30/2015. (Martinez, A)
June 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 49 STIPULATION Regarding the Scheduling of Depositions of Defendant's Agents and ORDER Thereon signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 6/11/2015. Motion to Compel 35 is DENIED as moot. (Martinez, A)
June 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 44 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 6/3/2015. (Martinez, A)
June 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER Granting Plaintiffs' 38 Ex Parte Application for Order Shortening Time signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 6/1/2015. Informal Telephonic Conference Call re Motion to Compel set for 6/4/2015 at 10:00 AM; Hearing re Motion to Compel set for 6/5/2015 at 9:30 a.m. (Martinez, A)
May 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER RE: Motions to Compel 19 , 20 signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 5/16/2015. (Martinez, A)
May 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER Approving Stipulation re Partial Resolution of Disputed Issues re 30 signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 5/13/2015. (Martinez, A)
August 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES: Lead Case is 1:14-cv-00346 LJO-GSA Civil Case, Member Case is 1:14-cv-00671 LJO-GSA; MEMBER CASE CLOSED; all Future Filings to be made in Lead Case; signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 08/15/2014. (Flores, E)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Endsley v. Travelers Property Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L. Stephen Endsley
Represented By: Kirnpreet Kaur Virk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Property Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Michelle Lynn Law
Represented By: G. Edward Rudloff, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?