Coleman et al v. Green Tree Servicing LLC
Plaintiff: Kari Ann Coleman and Brian Coleman
Defendant: Green Tree Servicing LLC
Case Number: 1:2014cv00454
Filed: March 28, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Presiding Judge: Sheila K. Oberto
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION and ORDER for Dismissal of the Fair Debt Collection Practices Act Cause of Action with Prejudice and REMANDING CASE to Superior Court of California, Tulare County signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 06/12/2014. Copy of remand order sent to other court. CASE CLOSED. (Flores, E)
June 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SECOND STIPULATION and ORDER to extend time to respond to first amended complaint. Defendant shall file a response to the First Amended Complaint by no later than June 6, 2014. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 6/3/2014. (Timken, A)
May 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION and ORDER to Respond to First Amended Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 5/17/2014.(Pursuant to the parties' stipulation, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant shall file its response to Plaintiffs first amended complaint on or before May 30, 2014.) (Gaumnitz, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coleman et al v. Green Tree Servicing LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Green Tree Servicing LLC
Represented By: Mary Kate Sullivan
Represented By: Robert Travis Campbell
Represented By: Thomas N. Abbott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kari Ann Coleman
Represented By: Todd M. Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Coleman
Represented By: Todd M. Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?