Robles v. AgReserves, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Juan Carlos Robles
Defendant: AgReserves, Inc., The Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, South Valley Farms, Jorge Campos and Jay Payne
Case Number: 1:2014cv00540
Filed: April 16, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:451
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 156 Parties' Joint Stipulation for Dismissal of Defendant Agreserves, Inc.'s Counter-Claim Against Plaintiff in Exchange for Waiver of Costs and to Vacate Hearing Dates and ORDER Thereon, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 4/14/16. (Marrujo, C)
March 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 142 Parties' Joint STIPULATION For Dismissal Of The 1st Cause Of Action For Discrimination Based On National Origin (Only) In Violation Of Title VII, And The 14th Cause Of Action For Wrongful Termination In Violation Of Public Policy, ORDER, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 3/22/2016. (Fahrney, E)
March 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER OF CLARIFICATION Following Summary Judgment and Receipt of Proposed Jury Instructions and Verdict Forms, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 3/18/2016. (Gaumnitz, R)
February 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 73 SUPPLEMENTAL PRE-TRIAL ORDER, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 2/19/2016. (Kusamura, W)
January 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER on Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment 32 , 33 , 34 , signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 1/27/16. (Gonzalez, R)
October 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 31 STIPULATION AND ORDER for DISMISSAL with prejudice of Defendant South Valley Almond Company, LLC and The Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 10/13/2015. (Martin-Gill, S)
May 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATION and ORDER 26 for Plaintiff Juan Carlos Robles to Submit to Mental Examination, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 5/4/2015. (Hall, S)
January 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING 19 Stipulation for Defendant AgReserves, Inc. to File a Counterclaim, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/6/2015. (Hall, S)
August 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/1/2014. Consent/Decline Deadline 8/11/2014. Pleading Amendment Deadline 10/1/2014. Discovery Deadlines: Initial Disclosures 8/8/2014; Non-Expert 6/15/2015; Expert 8/24/2015. Mid -Discovery Status Conference set for 1/15/2015 at 09:00 AM in Bakersfield at 510 19th Street (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Non-Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filed by 9/9/2015; Hearing by 10/7/2015. Dispositive Motion Deadli nes: Filed by 10/20/2015; Hearing by 12/1/2015. Pretrial Conference set for 1/16/2016 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii. Jury Trial set for 3/22/2016 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii. (Hall, S)
June 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DENYING 4 Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/26/2014. (Hall, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robles v. AgReserves, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Carlos Robles
Represented By: Karl Gerber
Represented By: Ann Benin Guleser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AgReserves, Inc.
Represented By: Richard D. Marca
Represented By: Jamie E. Wrage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: South Valley Farms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jorge Campos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay Payne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?