Freeman v. Martin et al
Plaintiff: Demetrius Terrell Freeman
Defendant: A. Martin and Jackie Ciufo
Case Number: 1:2014cv00575
Filed: April 21, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Merced
Presiding Judge: Gary S. Austin
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 FINDINGS of FACT by DISTRICT COURT; ORDER for Clerk to Serve these Findings on the Clerk for the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 5/19/17. (Gonzalez, R)
May 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER Adopting 29 Findings and Recommendations; ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 28 Motion for Preliminary Injunctive Relief, for Lack of Jurisdiction, signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 5/12/17. (Gonzalez, R)
April 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending that Plaintiff's 28 Motion for Preliminary Injunctive Relief be Denied for Lack of Jurisdiction; Objections, if any, Due within Fourteen (14) Days signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 4/13/2017. Referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. Objections to F&R due by 5/1/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
March 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER for Plaintiff to File Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury, and Other Evidence, as Described By This Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 3/24/17: 45-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
February 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Denying Motion As Moot (Doc. 17 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 2/9/2015. (Fahrney, E)
December 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 12/12/2014 denying 14 Motion as moot and for Clerk to mail copies of case documents to plaintiff 11 , 12 , 13 .(Lundstrom, T)
September 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 11 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATION That This Action be Dismissed for Failure to Prosecute, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 9/29/2014, referred to Judge O'Neill. Objections to F&R Due Within Thirty Days. (Marrujo, C)
August 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 8 Motion for Stay signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 08/21/2014. (Flores, E)
May 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Request For Court Orders (Doc. 5 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 5/23/2014. (Fahrney, E)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Freeman v. Martin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Demetrius Terrell Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Martin
Represented By: Litigation Coordinator
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jackie Ciufo
Represented By: Litigation Coordinator
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?