Butler v. Unknown
Petitioner: Karen Butler
Respondent: Unknown
Case Number: 1:2014cv00645
Filed: April 25, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Riverside
Presiding Judge: Barbara A. McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER DENYING PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus and ORDER DECLINING to Issue a Certificate of Appealability signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 2/17/2017. CASE CLOSED. (Jessen, A)
February 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Directing Clerk of Court to Amend Caption signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 02/15/2017. (Flores, E)
April 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Granting Petitioner's Motion to Amend the Petition to Name a Proper Respondent 13 ; ORDER Directing the Clerk to Change the Name of Respondent; ORDER Requiring Respondent to File a Response to the Petition; ORDER Setting a Briefing Schedule; ORDER Directing the Clerk to Serve Documents on the Attorney General, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/8/15. (Verduzco, M)
February 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Denying Motion For Appointment Of Counsel (Document# 10 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 2/17/2015. (Fahrney, E)
February 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER To Petitioner To Move To Amend The First Amended Petition To Name A New Respondent No Later Than Thirty Days After Service Of This Order, Filing Deadline: Thirty (30) Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 2/12/2015. (Motions filed by 3/16/2015.)(Fahrney, E)
November 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER to Petitioner to Move to Amend the First Amended Petition to Name a New Respondent no Later than Thirty Days after Service of this Order signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/04/2014. (Flores, E)
May 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER of INTRADISTRICT TRANSFER from Sacramento (2:14-cv-1022 AC) to Fresno (1:14-cv-0645 BAM) signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 4/30/14. (Kastilahn, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Butler v. Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Karen Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?