County of Stanislaus v. Travelers Indemnity Company
Plaintiff: County of Stanislaus
Defendant: Travelers Indemnity Company
Case Number: 1:2014cv00666
Filed: May 5, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Stanislaus
Presiding Judge: UnassignedDJ
Presiding Judge: Sandra M. Snyder
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 12/7/2018: In advance of the 1/15/2019 Bench Trial, the court hereby sets a Status Conference for 1/2/2019 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. By 12/20/2018, the parties shall submit a joint status report setting forth the status of this case and file revised pretrial statements pursuant to Local Rule 281. (See document for further details.)(Kirksey Smith, K)
April 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 4/9/2018: A bench trial regarding whether certain nonlegal invoices are defense costs is set for 1/15/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. By 6/8/2018, the p arties shall submit a joint status report setting forth any other issues they agree may be resolved at the 1/15/2019 bench trial, including whether the court may decide if any contamination was "sudden and accidental" under the terms of plaintiff's policy with defendant. (Kirksey Smith, K)
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 91 STIPULATION and ORDER for continuance 90 signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 2/26/2018 resetting the Status Conference for 4/9/2018 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. The bench trial scheduled for March 20, 2018 is vacated. A Joint Status Report shall be filed no later than March 26, 2018. (Kirksey Smith, K)
January 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 82 STIPULATION and ORDER 81 signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 1/27/2017 continuing the Scheduling Conference to 3/13/2017 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. A Joint STatus Report shall be filed by 2/27/2017. (Kirksey Smith, K)
November 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 11/18/16 ORDERING the parties to meet and confer and submit a Joint Status Report by 2/13/2017 and the Status Conference is RESET for 2/27/2017 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb.(Washington, S)
October 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 69 STIPULATION and ORDER re Waiver of Jury 67 signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 10/4/2016. (Kirksey Smith, K)
April 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 4/29/16 ORDERING the Court hereby modifies the Pretrial Scheduling Order as follows; the Trial is reset for 10/25/16 at 09:00 AM; the Final Pretrial Conference is reset for 8/29/16 at 01:30 PM. (Becknal, R)
February 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 2/17/2016 DENYING 46 Defendant's Motion for Reconsideration. Because oral argument is unnecessary on this motion, the court hereby VACATES the hearing set for 2/22/2016 pursuant to Eastern District Local Rule 230(g). (Kirksey Smith, K)
November 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 43 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 11/20/2015 CONTINUING the Final Pretrial Conference to 5/9/2016 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb; CONTINUING the Jury Trial to 7/12/2016 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Michel, G.)
November 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MEMORANDUM and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 11/5/2015 re 28 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment and 29 Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment: IT IS ORDERED that 29 Plaintiff's Motion for Summ ary Judgment be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED with respect to defendant's duty to defend under the policy and DENIED in all other respects; and 28 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED with respect to any pre-tender costs and DENIED in all other respects. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that discovery is reopened for forty-five days from the date of this Order for the limited purpose of defendant deposing Tom Bower. (Kirksey Smith, K)
September 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 9/15/2015 ORDERING that plaintiff shall resubmit any evidence no later than 10/9/2015 and defendant may submit any objections to that evidence no later than 10/16/2015. The hearing on the 28 , 29 cross-motions for summary judgment set for 9/21/2015 is hereby RESET for 11/2/2015. (Zignago, K.)
June 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER setting dates for disclosure of experts/production of expert reports as follows: The parties shall disclose experts and produce expert reports in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a)(2) by no later than July 31, 2015, and, with regard to expert testimony intended solely for rebuttal, those experts shall be disclosed and reports produced in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a)(2) on or before August 14, 2015, in accordance with applicable statutes, the Eastern District of California local rules, and any applicable standing orders of this Court. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 6/25/2015. (Rooney, M)
May 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Order setting date for completion of discovery, signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 5/8/2015. (Discovery due by 6/17/2015) (Rosales, O)
April 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Order setting dates for disclosure of experts/production of expert reports, signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 4/13/2015. (Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 6/29/2015) (Rosales, O)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: County of Stanislaus v. Travelers Indemnity Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: County of Stanislaus
Represented By: Benjamin Perkins Syz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Indemnity Company
Represented By: Lori A. Schweitzer
Represented By: Linda I. Yen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?