Elhouty v. Lincoln Benefit Life Company
Plaintiff: Kamies Elhouty
Defendant: Lincoln Benefit Life Company
Case Number: 1:2014cv00676
Filed: May 7, 2014
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER GRANTING Defendant's 35 Motion for Summary Judgment, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 8/5/15. CASE CLOSED. (Marrujo, C)
July 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 36 STIPULATION and ORDER 34 to Allow Rule 30(B)(6) Deposition of Lincoln Benefit Life Company, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 7/9/2015. (Hall, S)
May 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER DENYING 31 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration of the Order Striking Plaintiff's Expert Designation; ORDER DENYING AS MOOT 30 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend the Scheduling Order Related to Expert Discovery, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 5/7/2015. (Hall, S)
April 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER GRANTING 26 Defendant's Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Expert Designation, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 4/23/2015. Hearing on motion to strike 26 set for 4/30/2015 at 10:00 AM is VACATED. (Hall, S)
January 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER GRANTING 24 Stipulation to Amend Scheduling Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/28/2015. Non-expert discovery deadline is extended to 5/4/2015. (Hall, S)
November 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 21 PROTECTIVE ORDER Granted as Modified by the Court, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 11/17/2014. (Hall, S)
August 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SCHEDULING ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/21/2014. Consent/Decline Deadline 9/2/2014. Pleading Amendment Deadline 11/17/2014. Discovery Deadlines: Non-Expert 2/9/2015; Expert 5/8/2015. Mid-Discovery Status Conference set for 11/5/2014 at 09:30 AM in Bakersfield at 510 19th Street (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Non-Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filed by 5/22/2015; Hearing by 6/19/2015. Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filed by 7/8/2015; Hearing by 8/19/2015. Pretrial Conference set for 10/14/2015 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. Jury Trial set for 12/15/2015 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. (Hall, S)
June 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER to Jason P. Gosselin to Submit Amended Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice re 8 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/4/2014. (Hall, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Elhouty v. Lincoln Benefit Life Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lincoln Benefit Life Company
Represented By: Ryan S Fife
Represented By: Katherine Villanueva, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kamies Elhouty
Represented By: Bob H Joyce
Represented By: Amanda M Lucas
Represented By: Andrew K. Sheffield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?