Bernal v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Irma Rico Bernal
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2014cv00733
Filed: May 15, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Sheila K. Oberto
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER DENYING 20 Motion for and AWARD of EAJA FEES and EXPENSES. Plaintiff's June 18, 2015, EAJA application is untimely and is not subject to equitable tolling. Accordingly, it is HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion for an award of EAJA fees and expenses is DENIED. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 8/12/2015. (Timken, A)
March 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Of Remand (Doc. 16 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 3/19/2015. CASE CLOSED. (Fahrney, E)
January 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING PARTIES STIPULATED REQUEST FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME. Defendant's request for a 30-day extension of time to serve her confidential letter brief on Plaintiff is GRANTED; Defendant shall serve her confidential letter brief on Plaintiff by no later than February 27, 2015; and by no later than April 2, 2015, the parties shall file a stipulated request for remand or Plaintiff shall file her opening brief if no agreement to remand is reached. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 1/30/2015. (Timken, A)
January 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER APPROVING Parties' Stipulated Request for an Extension of Time. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 1/7/2015. (Timken, A)
May 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING 3 Motion to Proceed IFP, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 5/19/2014. (Marrujo, C)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bernal v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irma Rico Bernal
Represented By: Kelsey Mackenzie Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Donna Wade Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?