Briones v. Pleasant Valley State Prison et al
Plaintiff: Johnny Gavino Briones
Defendant: Pleasant Valley State Prison, Scott Fravenhein, R. Hand, C. Hendricks, D. Moore, C. Cole, Santos, Walker and Clark
Case Number: 1:2014cv00750
Filed: May 19, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Gary S. Austin
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 52 Motion for Reconsideration, signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 2/23/17. (Marrujo, C)
December 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER Requiring Plaintiff to Provide Additional Evidence Regarding his Motin for Reconsideration, signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 12/22/2016. (Case Management Deadline: 2/3/2017) (Martin-Gill, S)
October 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 10/11/2016. CASE CLOSED.(Lundstrom, T)
August 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 46 NOTICE and WARNING of Requirements for Opposing Defendants' 45 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to Exhaust/ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 8/22/16. (Martin-Gill, S)
June 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS 40 ; ORDER for This Action to Proceed Only Against Defendants Moore, Hendricks, Hand, and Cole on Plaintiff's Excessive Force Claims, and DISMISSING All Other Claims and Defendants, signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 6/8/16. (Hellings, J)
May 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 40 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that this action proceed only against defendants R. Moore, C. Hendricks, R.Hand and C. Cole on Plaintiff's eighth amendment excessive force claims; all remaining claims and defendants be dismissed from this action re 31 Amended Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint filed by Johnny G. Briones ; referred to Judge O'Neill,signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 05/06/2016. Objections to F&R due by 6/1/2016 (Martin-Gill, S)
February 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER GRANTING 28 Motion for Extension of Time Nunc Pro Tunc; ORDER GRANTING 29 Motion to Accept Second Amended Complaint; ORDER VACATING 23 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 2/18/2015. (Sant Agata, S)
December 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 23 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Dismiss Case for Failure to Obey Court Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 12/18/2014, referred to Judge O'Neill. Objections to F&R Due by 1/23/2015. (Marrujo, C)
August 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motion For Reconsideration As Moot (Doc. 13 ), ORDER Denying Request For Free Copies (Doc. 12 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 8/28/2014. (Fahrney, E)
August 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER STRIKING Plaintiff's Objections for Lack of Signature, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 8/5/14. (Martin-Gill, S)
July 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 6 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Dismiss 1 Case for Failure to Obey Court Order signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 07/09/2014. Referred to Judge 07/09/2014; Objections to F&R due by 8/12/2014. (Flores, E)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Briones v. Pleasant Valley State Prison et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnny Gavino Briones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pleasant Valley State Prison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Fravenhein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Hand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Hendricks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Santos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?