Parker v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Katina Ann Parker
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2014cv00763
Filed: May 20, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Barbara A. McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES PURSUANT TO 42 U.S.C. § 1383(d)(2)(B) (Doc. No. 28 ) signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 04/22/2019. The Court ORDERS Plaintiff's counsel's motion for attorneys' ; fees under 42 U.S.C. §1383(d)(2)(B) (Doc. No. 28) is GRANTED. Plaintiff's counsel is awarded $9,970.00 in attorneys' fees pursuant to 42 U.S.C. § 406(b). Plaintiff's counsel shall compensate Plaintiff in the amount of $8,800.00 for fees previously awarded pursuant to the EAJA. (Gonzales, V)
January 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER for Award of Equal Access to Justice Act Attorney Fees and Expenses Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2412(d) and Costs Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1920. Based upon the parties Stipulation for the Award and Payment of Equal Access to Justice Act F ees, Costs, and Expenses (Stipulation) filed on January 30, 2018 (Doc. 25), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that fees and expenses in the amount of eight thousand five hundred dollars ($8,500.00) as authorized by 28 U.S.C. § 2412, and no additional costs under 28 U.S.C. § 1920, be awarded subject to the terms of the Stipulation. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/31/2018. (Herman, H)
November 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER REMANDING CASE for further proceedings signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/6/2017. CASE CLOSED. (Lundstrom, T)
August 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Regarding Plaintiff's Social Security Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 08/05/2015. CASE CLOSED. (Flores, E)
May 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING Motion to Proceed IFP 2 , signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 5/22/14. (Hellings, J)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parker v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katina Ann Parker
Represented By: Vijay Jagdish Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?