MP Nexlevel of California, Inc. v. Apex Directional Drilling, LLC
Plaintiff: MP Nexlevel of California, Inc.
Defendant: Apex Directional Drilling, LLC
Case Number: 1:2014cv00857
Filed: June 5, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: UnassignedDJ
Presiding Judge: Barbara A. McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 45 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 3/13/2015 ORDERING that the 43 Stipulation is hereby GRANTED AS REQUESTED, and this matter is dismissed without prejudice. CASE CLOSED. (Zignago, K.)
October 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 10/29/2014 ORDERING 29 that the parties need not file a joint scheduling report in this case until thirty days after the resolution of the consolidation/coordination issue. The parties shall promptly notify the Court when the consolidation/coordination issue has been resolved. (Reader, L)
September 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 8/29/14 re: 21 ORDERING that: i) the parties may postpone preparation of the required Rule 26(f) Joint Status Report until a time after the Court decides Apex's pending motion to dismiss; and, ii) should the Court deny Apex's motion to dismiss, the parties shall file their joint status report no later than sixty (60) days after the Court's ruling on the motion to dismiss. (Meuleman, A)
July 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION and ORDER to Reschedule RL 26(f) Conference Currently Set for August 26, 2014: Initial SCHEDULING CONFERENCE is continued from 8/26/14 to October 15, 2014 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McA uliffe. The Telephonic Status Conference to discuss the procedures in light of Sacramento designation and Magistrate Judge jurisdiction SET for AUGUST 5, 2014 at 10:00 a.m. shall REMAIN on calendar as set. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 7/28/2014. (Herman, H)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MP Nexlevel of California, Inc. v. Apex Directional Drilling, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MP Nexlevel of California, Inc.
Represented By: John Benjamin Patrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apex Directional Drilling, LLC
Represented By: Patrick S Schoenburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?