Ramirez v. Bakersfield Police Dept., et al.
Plaintiff: Antonio Ramirez, Jr.
Defendant: Bakersfield Police Department, Randy Petris and Scott Roberts
Case Number: 1:2014cv00978
Filed: June 23, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: UnassignedDJ
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER Granting 46 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/22/15. CASE CLOSED. (Gonzalez, R)
August 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER GRANTING 42 Defendants' Motion to Compel, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/7/2015. (Hall, S)
May 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 41 SCHEDULING ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 5/4/2015. Pleading Amendment Deadline 9/25/2015. Discovery Deadlines: Initial Disclosures 6/5/2015; Non-Expert 2/1/2016; Expert 4/8/2016. Mid-Discovery Status Conference set for 11 /10/2015 at 09:00 AM in Bakersfield at 510 19th Street (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Non-Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filed by 4/18/2016; Hearing by 5/16/2016. Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filed by 5/23/2016; Hearing by 7/5 /2016. Pretrial Conference set for 8/16/2016 at 08:30 AM in Bakersfield at 510 19th Street (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Jury Trial set for 9/26/2016 at 08:30 AM in Bakersfield at 510 19th Street (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Hall, S)
March 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER & WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM for Plaintiff Antonio Ramirez, Jr. CDCR #AF-4707, for Telephonic Appearance on Monday, May 4, 2015 at 9:30a.m., signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 03/23/15. (Gonzalez, R)
December 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER DISMISSING Certain Claims; ORDER TERMINATING Defendants' 12 Motion to Dismiss as Moot, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/1/2014. Defendant Bakersfield Police Department terminated. (Hall, S)
November 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER DENYING 23 STAY, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 11/20/2014. (Hall, S)
August 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 10 INFORMATIONAL ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/4/2014. (Hall, S)
June 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING 3 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis; ORDER DIRECTING Plaintiff to File a First Amended Complaint or Notify the Court of His Willingness to Proceed Only on Claims Found to be Cognizable, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/30/2014. (Hall, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ramirez v. Bakersfield Police Dept., et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio Ramirez, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bakersfield Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Petris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?