Lopez v. Berkebile et al
Plaintiff: Gilfredo Lopez
Defendant: D. Berkebile, Brubaker, Samuel J. Patrick, Hope Chance, M. Salmons, J. Hall, S. Lockwood, Melissa Parr, C. Eichenlaub, Terry O'Brien, D. Sweeney, Landon, Vankirk, Gilmore, Grimm, Boyles, P. A. Meyers, Paul Copenhaver, K. Rodriguez, Gardea, Coles, Scott and Lyons
Case Number: 1:2014cv01003
Filed: June 26, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Merced
Presiding Judge: Barbara A. McAuliffe
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Regarding Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Judgment 17 , signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 8/23/16: Motion is DENIED. (Hellings, J)
August 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REGARDING Plaintiff's 15 Motion to Supplement and Clarify Plaintiff's Rule 60(b)(60) Motion, signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 8/18/16. (Marrujo, C)
August 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER DENYING 13 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration Pursuant to Rule 60(b)(6) signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 8/10/2016. (Jessen, A)
March 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING Extension of Time to File Objections to Findings and Recommendations per 10 , signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 03/215. (Martin-Gill, S)
January 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 9 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Dismissal of Claims Against Staff at USP Big Sandy and USP Hazelton Without Prejudice for Improper Venue and Dismissal of Action With Prejudice for Failure to State a Claim, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/27/15, referred to Judge O'Neill. Objections to F&R Due Within Thirty Days. (Marrujo, C)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lopez v. Berkebile et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gilfredo Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Berkebile
Represented By: Bureau of Prisons Regional Counsel
Represented By: Litigation Coordinator
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brubaker
Represented By: Bureau of Prisons Regional Counsel
Represented By: Litigation Coordinator
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuel J. Patrick
Represented By: Bureau of Prisons Regional Counsel
Represented By: Litigation Coordinator
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hope Chance
Represented By: Bureau of Prisons Regional Counsel
Represented By: Litigation Coordinator
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Salmons
Represented By: Bureau of Prisons Regional Counsel
Represented By: Litigation Coordinator
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Hall
Represented By: Bureau of Prisons Regional Counsel
Represented By: Litigation Coordinator
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Lockwood
Represented By: Bureau of Prisons Regional Counsel
Represented By: Litigation Coordinator
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melissa Parr
Represented By: Bureau of Prisons Regional Counsel
Represented By: Litigation Coordinator
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Eichenlaub
Represented By: Bureau of Prisons Regional Counsel
Represented By: Litigation Coordinator
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry O'Brien
Represented By: Bureau of Prisons Regional Counsel
Represented By: Litigation Coordinator
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Sweeney
Represented By: Bureau of Prisons Regional Counsel
Represented By: Litigation Coordinator
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Landon
Represented By: Bureau of Prisons Regional Counsel
Represented By: Litigation Coordinator
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vankirk
Represented By: Bureau of Prisons Regional Counsel
Represented By: Litigation Coordinator
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gilmore
Represented By: Bureau of Prisons Regional Counsel
Represented By: Litigation Coordinator
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grimm
Represented By: Bureau of Prisons Regional Counsel
Represented By: Litigation Coordinator
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boyles
Represented By: Bureau of Prisons Regional Counsel
Represented By: Litigation Coordinator
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P. A. Meyers
Represented By: Bureau of Prisons Regional Counsel
Represented By: Litigation Coordinator
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Copenhaver
Represented By: Bureau of Prisons Regional Counsel
Represented By: Litigation Coordinator
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Rodriguez
Represented By: Bureau of Prisons Regional Counsel
Represented By: Litigation Coordinator
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gardea
Represented By: Bureau of Prisons Regional Counsel
Represented By: Litigation Coordinator
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coles
Represented By: Bureau of Prisons Regional Counsel
Represented By: Litigation Coordinator
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott
Represented By: Bureau of Prisons Regional Counsel
Represented By: Litigation Coordinator
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lyons
Represented By: Bureau of Prisons Regional Counsel
Represented By: Litigation Coordinator
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?