Cross v. Kings County District Attorney's Office et al
Plaintiff: Jerome Lee Cross
Defendant: Kings County District Attorney's Office, Kings County Sheriff's Department and Tolbert
Case Number: 1:2014cv01073
Filed: July 9, 2014
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Stanley A. Boone
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 23 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Dismissal of 22 Action for Failure to State a Cognizable Claim for Relief signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 03/31/2015. (Flores, E)
March 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Vacating 17 Findings and Recommendations Issued February 18, 2015, and Directing Clerk of Court to File 20 Third Amended Complaint Lodged on March 4, 2015 signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 03/31/2015. (Flores, E)
February 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 17 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Dismissal of 15 Action for Failure to State a Cognizable Claim upon Which Relief may be Granted signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 02/18/2015. Referred to Judge Ishii; Objections to F&R due by 3/23/2015.(Flores, E)
July 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 6 Motion to Amend as Unnecessary, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/29/2014. (Marrujo, C)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cross v. Kings County District Attorney's Office et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerome Lee Cross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kings County District Attorney's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kings County Sheriff's Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tolbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?