Campos v. County of Kern et al

Plaintiff: Keanu Ethan Campos
Defendant: County of Kern, Jason Ayala and Joshua Bathe
Case Number: 1:2014cv01099
Filed: July 14, 2014
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Referring Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 6, 2017 122 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT dated *10/6/2017* in favor of defendants and against plaintiff according to the jury special verdict returned in open court on 10/6/2017, Civil Case Terminated. CASE CLOSED. (Gaumnitz, R)
March 7, 2017 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Defendants' 36 Motion for Summary Judgment in Part and Denying in Part, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 3/7/2017. (This action is referred back to the assigned magistrate judge for re-scheduling, including the setting of a mandatory settlement conference, Final Pretrial Conference and jury trial dates.) (Gaumnitz, R)
October 5, 2016 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 60 Stipulation re Mandatory Settlement Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/5/2016. Settlement Conference CONTINUED to 12/8/2016 at 09:30 AM in Bakersfield at 510 19th Street (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Hall, S)
June 21, 2016 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 57 Stipulation to Continue the Settlement Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/21/2016. Settlement Conference CONTINUED to 8/12/2016 at 01:30 PM in Bakersfield at 510 19th Street (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Hall, S)
April 25, 2016 50 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER 49 Continuing the Mandatory Settlement Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 4/25/2016. Settlement Conference CONTINUED to 5/17/2016 at 01:30 PM in Bakersfield at 510 19th Street (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Hall, S)
March 24, 2016 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART 46 Stipulation re Mandatory Settlement Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/24/2016. Settlement Conference CONTINUED to 5/2/2016 at 01:30 PM in Bakersfield at 510 19th Street (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Hall, S)
March 17, 2016 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Submission of Additional Briefing 36 , signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 3/17/2016. (1. Defendants are directed to file a brief clarifying their position on summary judgment as to plaintiffs wrongful death claim, within seven days of this order. Defendants' brief may be no longer than five pages in length. 2. Plaintiff is granted leave to file, at their election, an opposition brief to defendants' supplemental brief, within fourteen days of this order. Plaintiff's brief may be no longer than five pages in length.)(Gaumnitz, R)
January 6, 2016 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 33 Stipulation to Continue Settlement Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/6/2016. Settlement Conference CONTINUED to 4/1/2016 at 09:30 AM in Bakersfield at 510 19th Street (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Hall, S)
January 14, 2015 26 Opinion or Order of the Court SCHEDULING ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/14/2015. Consent/Decline Deadline 1/26/2015. Pleading Amendment Deadline 4/13/2015. Discovery Deadlines: Initial Disclosures 2/4/2015; Non-Expert 10/5/2015; Expert 12/14/2015. Mi d-Discovery Status Conference set for 4/30/2015 at 09:00 AM in Bakersfield at 510 19th Street (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Non-Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filed by 12/28/2015; Hearing by 1/25/2016. Dispositive Motion Deadl ines: Filed by 2/10/2016; Hearing by 3/23/2016. Settlement Conference set for 1/11/2016 at 09:30 AM in Bakersfield at 510 19th Street (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Pretrial Conference set for 5/18/2016 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. Jury Trial set for 7/19/2016 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. (Hall, S)
October 1, 2014 17 Opinion or Order of the Court Memorandum Decision and ORDER Re: Defendants' 11 Motion to Dismiss or for a More Definite Statement, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 09/30/14. Amended Complaint Due Within Twenty Days. (Gonzalez, R)
July 18, 2014 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 3 Petition to Appoint Deniz Gonzalez as Guardian ad Litem for the Minor Plaintiff, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 7/18/2014. (Hall, S)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Campos v. County of Kern et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keanu Ethan Campos
Represented By: Greg Wegner Garrotto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Kern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Ayala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Bathe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?