Chamberlain et al v. Mims et al
Plaintiff: Natalie Chamberlain and Stacey Williams
Defendant: Margaret Mims and County of Fresno
Case Number: 1:2014cv01106
Filed: July 15, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Seng
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 6/3/15 ORDERING that Defendants' 31 Motion for Reconsideration is DENIED. In light of this ruling, Defendants' 34 Motion for Stay of Enforcement pending the outcome of its reconsideration request is DENIED as moot. To the extent Plaintiff requests additional attorney's fees in having to respond to these motions, that request is also DENIED. (Kastilahn, A)
January 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 33 STIPULATION and ORDER continuing Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration to 2/19/2015 at 2:00 p.m. in courtroom 7. Signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 1/5/2015. (Deutsch, S)
November 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 11/24/14 ORDERING that Plaintiffs' 11 Motion to Remand is GRANTED. Defendant's 7 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED as moot. Defendants are ordered to pay Plaintiffs $7,500.00 for costs and fees incurred, to be paid directly to Plaintiffs' counsel not later than 30 days following the date this Memorandum and Order is electronically filed. Case is REMANDED to Superior Court of the State of California, County of Fresno for final adjudication. CASE CLOSED. (cc: certified copy to Superior Court of Fresno County) (Kastilahn, A)
November 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY DISPUTES, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 11/10/2014. (Yu, L)
September 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 9/12/2014 ORDERING that the joint status report shall be filed within 30 days after the ruling on the Motion to Remand and Motion to Dismiss. (Donati, J)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chamberlain et al v. Mims et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natalie Chamberlain
Represented By: Novella Yvette Coleman
Represented By: Michael Temple Risher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacey Williams
Represented By: Novella Yvette Coleman
Represented By: Michael Temple Risher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margaret Mims
Represented By: Michael Robert Linden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Fresno
Represented By: Michael Robert Linden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?