Blair v. CDCR et al
Plaintiff: Perry C. Blair
Defendant: CDCR, Corcoran State Prison, SATF State Prison, J. Johnson, O. A. Ybarra, Chan, B. O. Daniels, F. Franoco, J. Alva and Santos
Case Number: 1:2014cv01156
Filed: July 24, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Stanley A. Boone
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER GRANTING 149 Request for Extension of Time; ORDER Requiring Defendants to Serve a Copy of the Pending Motion for Summary Judgment 130 and January 29, 2020 Findings and Recommendations 133 on Plaintiff; and ORDER DENYING AS MOOT 150 M otion for Preliminary Injunction signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 9/4/2020. Plaintiff's Objections to Findings and Recommendations shall be due forty-five (45) days from the date on which the above-mentioned copies are served upon him. (Jessen, A)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER Affording Plaintiff Additional Time to File Objections to the January 29, 2020 Findings and Recommendations signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 7/9/2020. Objections to F&R due within thirty (30) days. (Jessen, A)
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 133 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Defendants' 130 Motion for Summary Judgment; Referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/29/2020. Objections to F&R due within TWENTY-ONE (21) DAYS. (Orozco, A)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER GRANTING Defendants' 127 Motion to Modify Scheduling Order as to Dispositive Motion Deadline, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/30/19. (Marrujo, C)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER ADOPTING 123 Findings and Recommendations, and Dismissing Certain Claims, Without Prejudice, for Failure to Exhaust the Administrative Remedies, signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 7/15/19. (Marrujo, C)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 123 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Following Evidentiary Hearing on Exhaustion of Administrative Remedies, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/17/19. Referred to Judge O'Neill. Objections to F&R Due Within Twenty-One Days. (Gonzalez, R)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER that Inmate Perry C. Blair, CDCR No. G-00398 is no Longer Needed as a Participant in these Proceedings, and the Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum is Discharged signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/24/2018. (Flores, E)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's Second 116 Motion for Extension of Time to File Exhibits for Evidentiary Hearing on October 24, 2018 signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/09/2018. (Flores, E)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER DENYING as Unnecessary Plaintiff's 113 Motion to Testify and Present Evidence at the Evidentiary Hearing Set for October 24, 2018, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/2/18. (Marrujo, C)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's 111 Request for an Extension of Time to File Exhibits, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/1/18. Deadline: October 15, 2018. (Marrujo, C)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER & WRIT of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum to Transport Inmate Perry C. Blair, CDCR# G-00398, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/25/18. (Marrujo, C)
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/20/2018 rescheduling Evidentiary Hearing to 10/24/2018 at 01:30 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone). (Lundstrom, T)
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER & WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM to Transport Plaintiff Perry C. Blair, CDC# G-00398 for Evidentiary Hearing on October 11, 2018 at 10:30 a.m. signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 09/11/2018. (Flores, E)
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER Setting Albino Evidentiary Hearing to Determine Disputed Issues of Fact Regarding Exhaustion of the Administrative Remedies,signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/7/18. (Evidentiary Hearing set for 10/11/2018 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone) (Martin-Gill, S)
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER adopting 99 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS, granting in part and denying in part Defendants' exhaustion related Motion for Summary Judgment 84 and referring matter back to Magistrate Judge for evidentiary hearing signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 7/30/2018. (Lundstrom, T)
July 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER Granting Defendants' 101 Request to Modify the Discovery and Scheduling Order, and Extending the Dispositive Motion Deadline for Ninety Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/10/18. Dispositive Motions Deadline: 10/10/2018. (Gonzalez, R)
May 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 99 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Defendants' 84 Motion for Summary Judgment for Failure to Exhaust the Administrative Remedies signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 05/25/2018. Referred to Judge O'Neill; Objections to F&R due by 6/28/2018.(Flores, E)
May 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 95 Motion for Copy of Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment and Ruling that Court will Consider Sur-Reply Filed in Response to Defendants' Reply signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 05/11/2018. (Flores, E)
April 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 91 Request for Copies signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/30/2018. (Sant Agata, S)
April 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 88 Motion to Compel, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/24/18. (Gonzalez, R)
January 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER ADOPTING 77 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS AS MOFIDIED Herein Allowing Action to Proceed on Certain Claims Against Certain Defendants, and Dismissing Certain Claims and Defendants signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 1/3/2018. (Jessen, A)
December 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's Motion to Extend the Time to Serve Supplemental Responses to Discovery and GRANTING Defendants' Motion to Extend the Deadline to File an Exhaustion-Based Motion for Summary Judgment 80 , 81 , signed by Magistrat e Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/21/2017: The deadline to file an exhaustion-based motion for summary judgment is extended to February 22, 2018, and Plaintiff is directed to produce supplemental responses to Defendants' discovery requests at his scheduled deposition on January 17, 2018. (Hellings, J)
November 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 77 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Dismissal of Certain Claims and Defendants signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/29/2017. Referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. Objections to F&R due by 12/18/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
November 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER Granting Defendants' 75 Request to Extend the Deadline for Filing an Exhaustion Motion for Summary Judgment signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/31/2017. Filing Deadline 01/16/2018. (Flores, E)
August 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER Directing Clerk of Court to Open New Action and the Amended Complaint, Filed by Plaintiff on June 30, 2017 be the Operative Complaint in the New Action and Directing Defendants to File a Further Response to the Second Amended Complaint within Thirty Days signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 08/01/2017.(Flores, E)
February 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 AMENDED ORDER ADOPTING 59 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS IN FULL and ORDER DENYING 57 & 58 Plaintiff's Motions for a Preliminary Injunction and/or Temporary Restraining Order signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 2/24/2017. (Jessen, A)
February 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER ADOPTING 59 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS and ORDER DENYING 57 & 58 Plaintiff's Motions for Injunctive Relief signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 2/23/2017. (Jessen, A)
December 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 59 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending that Plaintiff's 57 58 Motions for Injunctive Relief be Denied signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 14cv1156. Referred to Judge O'Neill; Objections to F&R due by 1/12/2017.(Flores, E)
September 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER Adopting 52 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS, GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART Defendants' 32 Motion to Dismiss signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 9/28/2016. (Sant Agata, S)
July 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 52 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, Defendants' Motion to Sever Claims, and Plaintiff's Motion to Amend 31 , 32 , 38 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/15/16: 30-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
February 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 33 Motion for Pretrial/Scheduling Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/18/16. (Verduzco, M)
January 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER DENYING 27 Motion for Service BY US Marshal as Unnecessary, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/25/2016. (Martin-Gill, S)
January 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER DENYING 21 Motion for Preliminary Injunction and/or for Temporary Restraining Order;ORDER ADOPTING 23 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 01/25/2016. (Martin-Gill, S)
October 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 19 Motion to Appoint Counsel, Without Prejudice signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/29/2015. (Sant Agata, S)
July 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Denying 3 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 07/31/2014. (Flores, E)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blair v. CDCR et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Perry C. Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CDCR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corcoran State Prison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SATF State Prison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: O. A. Ybarra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. O. Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F. Franoco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Alva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Santos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?