Smith v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Anthony Wayne Smith
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2014cv01210
Filed: July 31, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Barbara A. McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:0427
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Regarding Plaintiff's Social Security Complaint; Court Denies Plaintiff's appeal; Clerk directed to enter Judgment In Favor of Commissioner of Social Security and Against Plaintiff Anthony Wayne Smith, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 03/01/2016. CASE CASE CLOSED (Martin-Gill, S)
August 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION and ORDER for an Extension of 28 days for Defendant to File Her Opposition to Plaintiff's Opening Brief: that Defendant shall have an extension of time, to and including September 25, 2015, in which to file an opposition to Plaintiff's Opening Brief; and that all other deadlines set forth in the September 4, 2014 Case Management Order shall be extended accordingly. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 8/24/2015. (Herman, H)
May 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION and ORDER for an Extension of Time to Serve Plaintiff's Letter Brief. Pursuant to the stipulation, the parties joint request for an extension of time is granted nunc pro tunc. Plaintiffs Confidential Letter Brief is now due May 25, 2015. All other deadlines in the Courts scheduling order issued on September 4, 2014 (Doc. 5) are modified accordingly. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/30/2015. (Herman, H)
September 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING Motion to Proceed IFP 2 , signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 9/4/14. (Hellings, J)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Wayne Smith
Represented By: Jonathan Omar Pena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?