Hamilton v. Quinonez et al
Plaintiff: Eddie Hamilton
Defendant: J. Quinonez and E. Lozano
Case Number: 1:2014cv01216
Filed: August 4, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Seng
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER Vacating September 19, 2017 Order Requiring Dispositional Documents signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 09/26/2017. (Flores, E)
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER FOLLOWING Settlement; Vacating Dates and Directing Parties to File Dispositive Documents, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/19/17. (Marrujo, C)
February 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER Closing Case in Light of Stipulation for Dismissal signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 02/09/2017. CASE CLOSED.(Flores, E)
February 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER Following Settlement; Vacating Dates and Directing Parties to File Dispositive Documents signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 02/07/2017. (Flores, E)
January 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER & WRIT of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum for Eddie Hamilton, CDCR# AM-8122 on February 7, 2017 at 10:00 a.m., before Magistrate Judge Boone, Courtroom #9, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 1/4/17. (Hellings, J)
November 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER RESETTING Dispositive Motions Deadline to February 28, 2017, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 11/28/2016. (Dispositive Motions filed by 2/28/2017) (Martin-Gill, S)
November 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER SETTING Dispositive Motions Deadline December 15, 2016 signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 10/31/2016. (Sant Agata, S)
September 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part Defendants' Second 37 Motion to Compel; ORDER Denying Defendants' Request for Monetary Sanctions; ORDER Granting Defendants Request to Stay Deadline for Filing Dispostive Motions signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 09/19/2016. (Flores, E)
April 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part 27 Motion to Compel; ORDER Granting 33 Defendants' Request to Modify Scheduling Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 4/20/16. Dispositive Motions filed by 7/15/2016. (Gonzalez, R)
June 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part Plaintiff's 22 Motion to Compel Discovery signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 06/10/2015. (Flores, E)
April 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Adopting 20 Findings and Recommendations to: 1) Deny Request for Entry of Default, 2) Grant in Part and Deny in Part Plaintiff's 18 Motion to Strike Defendants' Affirmative Defenses, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 4/8/15. (Verduzco, M)
March 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 20 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to: 1) Deny Request for Entry of Default, 2) Grant in Part and Deny in Part Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Defendants' Affirmative Defenses, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 3/16/15. Referred to Judge O'Neill; 14-Day Deadline. (Verduzco, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hamilton v. Quinonez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eddie Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Quinonez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Lozano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?