Torres v. Waddel
Plaintiff: Gustavo Torres
Defendant: Waddel
Case Number: 1:2014cv01217
Filed: August 4, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Barbara A. McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER Adopting Findings and Recommendations 42 and Granting Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Failure to Exhaust Remedies 28 , signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 11/7/16. CASE CLOSED. (Verduzco, M)
September 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 42 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Defendants' Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss for Failure to Exhaust Administrative Remedies be Granted 28 , signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 9/2/16. Referred to Judge Drozd; 14-Day Deadline. (Verduzco, M)
October 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER DENYING 31 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/26/2015. (Jessen, A)
April 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER to Recaption Case, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/20/15. (Verduzco, M)
February 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER DENYING Motion for Appointment of Counsel 17 , signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 2/27/15: Motion is DENIED without prejudice. (Hellings, J)
October 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 14 Motion to Amend without Prejudice, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/20/14. 30-Day Deadline. (Verduzco, M)
October 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER DENYING Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction Without Prejudice 4 , signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/6/14: Motion is DENIED without prejudice. (Hellings, J)
October 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Regarding Plaintiff's 10 Motion to Amend, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/6/2014. Thirty Day Deadline to File Amended Complaint. (Marrujo, C)
August 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Denying 3 Motion to Appoint Counsel, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 8/13/14. (Verduzco, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Torres v. Waddel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gustavo Torres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Waddel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?